EP0983256 - TRIPTOLIDE DERIVATIVES USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/10] | NOVEL TRIPTOLIDE DERIVATIVES USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES | ||
[2003/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals Inc. Route 202-206, P.O. Box 6800 Bridgewater, NJ 08807-0800 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals Inc. Route 202-206, P.O. Box 6800 Bridgewater, NJ 08807-0800 / US | ||
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL, INC. Route 202-206 North, P.O. Box 6800 Bridgewater, NJ 08807-0800 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Michel, J. 3316 Westridge Court Lawrence, KS 66049 / US | 02 /
WICKRAMARATNE, Mahinda Nugasevana, Mathalana Rukgahawila / LK | 03 /
HEPPERLE, Michael 2 Clermont Crossing Court, Apt. L St. Louis, Missouri 63146 / US | [2000/22] |
Former [2000/10] | 01 /
JUNG, Michel, J. 3316 Westridge Court Lawrence, KS 66049 / US | ||
02 /
WICKRAMARATNE, Mahinda Nugasevana, Mathalana Rukgahawila / LK | |||
03 /
HEPPERLE, Michael 245 Spruce Mill Lane Scotch Plains, NJ 07076 / US | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio, et al Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Minoja, Fabrizio, Dr., et al Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Rossini, 8 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2000/10] | Macchetta, Francesco, et al GRUPPO LEPETIT S.p.A., Patent Department, Piazza Türr 5 20149 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98920897.0 | 27.04.1998 | [2000/10] | WO1998US08562 | Priority number, date | US19970862489 | 23.05.1997 Original published format: US 862489 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9852933 | Date: | 26.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0983256 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0983256 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/77, C07D493/04, A61K31/34, // (C07D493/04, 307:00, 303:00),(C07D493/04, 307:00, 307:00) | [2000/10] | CPC: |
C07D307/77 (EP);
C07D307/93 (KR);
A61K31/343 (KR);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] | Extension states | AL | 17.12.1999 | LT | 17.12.1999 | LV | 17.12.1999 | MK | 17.12.1999 | RO | 17.12.1999 | SI | 17.12.1999 | Title | German: | TRIPTOLID-DERIVATE GEEIGNET ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AUTOIMMUNKRANKHEITEN | [2003/30] | English: | TRIPTOLIDE DERIVATIVES USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES | [2003/30] | French: | DERIVES TRIPTOLIDES CONVENANT AU TRAITEMENT D'AFFECTIONS AUTO-IMMUNES | [2000/10] |
Former [2000/10] | TRIPTOLID-DERIVATE NÜTZLICH ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AUTOIMMUNKRANKHEITEN | ||
Former [2000/10] | NOVEL TRIPTOLIDE DERIVATIVES USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 13.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.01.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   04.02.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.2004 | BE | 10.03.2004 | CH | 10.03.2004 | CY | 10.03.2004 | FI | 10.03.2004 | LI | 10.03.2004 | NL | 10.03.2004 | IE | 27.04.2004 | LU | 27.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | DK | 10.06.2004 | GR | 10.06.2004 | SE | 10.06.2004 | PT | 10.08.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
CY | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
IE | 27.04.2004 | ||
LU | 27.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
IE | 27.04.2004 | ||
LU | 27.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
LU | 27.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
SE | 10.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9426265 (PHARMAGENESIS INC [US]) [DA] 28,31,34 * page 7; claim 1 *; | [PA]US5663335 (QI YOU MAO [US], et al) [PA] 1,10,19,28,31,34* column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 46; claim 1 *; | [A] - D. Q. YU ET AL, "Structure modification of triptolide", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930510), vol. 118, no. 19, Database accession no. 182770m, page 21, XP002073427 [A] 1,10,19,28,31,34 * abstract * | [ ] - YAOXUE XUEBAO, (1992), vol. 27, no. 11, pages 830 - 836 | [A] - C. P. ZHANG ET AL, "Diterpenoids from leaves of Tripterygium wildfordij", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930830), vol. 119, no. 9, Database accession no. 91202g, page 649, XP002073428 [A] 1,10,19 * abstract * | [ ] - YAOXUE XUEBAO, (1993), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 110 - 115 |