EP0980544 - HARDWARE ACCELERATOR FOR AN OBJECT-ORIENTED PROGRAMMING LANGUAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iReady Corporation Suite 202, 2903 Bunker Hill Lane Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states iReady Corporation Suite 200, 2903 Bunker Hill Lane Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POFF, Thomas, C. 2250 Homestead Court 204 Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 02 /
MINAMI, John, Shigeto Suite 428, 330 Elan Village Lane San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 03 /
KOYAMA, Ryo 343 Hawthorne Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98920921.8 | 30.04.1998 | [2000/08] | WO1998US08719 | Priority number, date | US19970045951P | 08.05.1997 Original published format: US 45951 P | US19970965540 | 06.11.1997 Original published format: US 965540 | [2000/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9850852 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0980544 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
G06F9/3879 (EP,US);
G06F9/38 (KR);
G06F9/45529 (EP,US);
G06F9/45504 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/08] | Title | German: | HARDWARE-BESCHLEUNIGER FÜR EINE OBJEKTORIENTIERTE PROGRAMMIERSPRACHE | [2000/08] | English: | HARDWARE ACCELERATOR FOR AN OBJECT-ORIENTED PROGRAMMING LANGUAGE | [2000/08] | French: | ACCELERATEUR DE MATERIEL POUR LANGAGE DE PROGRAMMATION ORIENTE OBJET | [2000/08] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/08] | 03.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0171934 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [Y] 4 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 2; figure 4; claim 1 *; | [A]US5218698 (MANDL WILLIAM J [US]) [A] 3,4 * claim 1 *; | [PX]EP0813147 (LSI LOGIC CORP [US]) [PX] 1,2,5-9,11 * abstract * | [XY] - GANDHI S, "GRAPHICS SOFTWARE AND HARDWARE DESIGN WITH THE 82786", MICROPROCESSORS AND MICROSYSTEMS, (198806), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 271 - 276, XP000050202 [X] 1,2,5-7,9,11 * the whole document * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-9331(88)90128-7 | [A] - HAMILTON M A, "JAVA AND THE SHIFT TO NET-CENTRIC COMPUTING", COMPUTER, (199608), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 31 - 39, XP000632765 [A] 2,5,8 * page 31 - page 34, column R, line 26 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.532043 | [X] - C.J. GEORGIOU ET AL, "An experimental coprocessor for implementing persisten objects on an IBM 4381", OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW (SIGOPS)., NEW YORK US, (198710), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 84 - 87, XP000211947 [X] 1-3 * page 84 * * page 87, column L, line 22 - column R, line 9 * * page 86, column L, line 56 - column R, line 39 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/36204.36188 |