EP1093335 - METHOD FOR TREATING COTYLEDONOUS PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkion Life Sciences LLC 3521 Silverside Road,Concord Plaza Quillen Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states Arkion Life Sciences LLC 3521 Silverside Road,Concord Plaza Quillen Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | ||
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states Arkion Life Sciences 3521 Silverside Road,Concord Plaza Quillen Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | ||
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states DCV, Inc. 3521 Silverside Road, Suite 2K Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINSOHN, George, E. 6 Gilmore Lane Elkton, MD 21921 / US | 02 /
BJORNSON, August, S. 4616 Weldin Road Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2001/17] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98920954.9 | 08.05.1998 | [2001/17] | WO1998US09027 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940790 | Date: | 19.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1093335 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/16, // (A01N43/16, 43:16, 25:24), A01N25:10 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
A01N43/16 (EP);
A01P21/00 (EP);
Y02A40/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG KEIMBLÄTTRIGER PFLANZEN | [2001/17] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING COTYLEDONOUS PLANTS | [2001/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE PLANTES COTYLEDONEES | [2001/17] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 30.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, LU, MC, SE | 09.04.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/18] | 26.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.01.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 | 12.01.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2001 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 | 12.01.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 | 12.01.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 | 12.01.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2001 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 | 12.01.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 | 12.01.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2001 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 | 12.01.2001 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 | 12.01.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.01.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH09143013 ; | [X]JPS6333310 ; | [X]JPH03198702 ; | [Y]JPS63216804 ; | [Y]JPH083011 ; | [Y]JPS63297305 ; | [A]JPS481878B ; | [A]JPH07203771 ; | [A]JPH0565368 ; | [A]WO8907395 (BENTECH LAB INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * page 5, line 7 - line 24 * * page 8, line 15 - line 33 * * page 43; example XXXIV *; | [Y]EP0365279 (ALLIED COLLOIDS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-19 * page 2, line 13 - line 15 * * page 2, line 38 - line 44 * * page 3, line 47 - line 49 *; | [A]WO9208741 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [PX]US5726123 (HEINSOHN GEORGE E [US], et al) [PX] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 97, no. 10, & JP09143013 A 19970603 (YAIZU SUISAN) [X] 1-19 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 12, Database accession no. 88-080717, XP002077208 & JPS6333310 A 19880213 (IHARA CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1-19 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 41, Database accession no. 91-299396, XP002077209 & JPH03198702 A 19910829 (LION CORP) [X] 7-9 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 42, Database accession no. 88-296419, XP002077210 & JPS63216804 A 19880909 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 96, no. 5, & JP08003011 A 19960109 (TADAMORO INOUE) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 03, Database accession no. 89-020572, XP002077211 & JPS63297305 A 19881205 (KATAKURA CHIKKARIN CO LTD) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 73-05114U, XP002077212 & JPS481878B B1 00000000 (SAKAMOTO M) [A] 1-19 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 40, Database accession no. 95-307044, XP002077213 & JPH07203771 A 19950808 (NISHIKAWA GOMU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-19 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 16, Database accession no. 93-129167, XP002077214 & JPH0565368 A 19930319 (BIHOKU FUNKA KOGYO KK) [A] 1-19 * abstract * |