EP0996795 - COMPOSITE STEEL/CONCRETE COLUMN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Le Groupe Canam Manac Inc. 270, chemin du Tremblay Boucherville, Quebec J4B 5X9 / CA | [2000/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINCENT, Richard 121, Longmore Drive Pointe-Claire, Québec H9S 5A4 / CA | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Santarelli, Marc, et al Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Santarelli, Marc, et al Cabinet Rinuy et Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98921306.1 | 14.05.1998 | [2000/18] | WO1998CA00480 | Priority number, date | CA19972206830 | 15.05.1997 Original published format: CA 2206830 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9851883 | Date: | 19.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0996795 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0996795 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04C3/34 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
E04C3/34 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, PT [2000/18] | Title | German: | SÄULE AUS VERBUNDSTAHL-BETON | [2001/20] | English: | COMPOSITE STEEL/CONCRETE COLUMN | [2000/18] | French: | COLONNE COMPOSITE EN ACIER/BETON | [2000/18] |
Former [2000/18] | SÄULE AUS VERBUNDSTHAL-BETON | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 10.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.10.2001 | IT | 24.10.2001 | PT | 24.01.2002 | ES | 30.04.2002 | IE | 14.05.2002 | GR | 31.05.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/46] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
IE | 14.05.2002 | ||
GR | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
IE | 14.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
IE | 14.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 24.01.2002 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2074320 (BRUNO BAUER) [Y] 1,3-6,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 2,11; | [A]US2083055 (CODDINGTON EDWIN D) [A] 4 * figure - *; | [DA]US3050161 (SHLAGER ABRAHAM E) [DA] 1-6,9,10* the whole document *; | [YA]WO9208018 (SALO SEPPO [FI]) [Y] 1,3-6,9,10 * page 3, paragraph 2; figure - * [A] 2,11 | by applicant | US915295 | US918643 | US1813118 | US2618148 | US2844023 | US2912849 | US3050161 | US3147571 | US3267627 | US3300912 | US3516213 | US3590547 | US3798867 | US3890750 | US3916592 | US3938294 | US4128980 | US4196558 | US4407106 | US4571913 | US4722156 | US4779395 | US4783940 | US5012622 | US5119614 | US5410847 |