Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0966704
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.09.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] |
05.10.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] |
14.08.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
21.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.04.2001 |
First examination report |
|
23.04.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
28.03.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.03.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.11.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
12.11.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
14.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|