blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973786

EP0973786 - CATALYST AND USE OF CATALYSTS IN POLYMERISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.04.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.04.2000Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.06.2000 [2000/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
An der B 43
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
An der B 43
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / JACOBS, Alexandra
Königsberger Strasse 14
D-65527 Niedernhausen / DE
02 / HEITZ, Walter
Am Schmidtborn 5
D-35274 Kirchhain / DE
03 / HEINZ, Beate
Sachsenring 24
D-35041 Marburg / DE
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date98921435.807.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998EP02003
Priority number, dateDE199711510411.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19715104
DE199711631218.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19716312
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9846614
Date:22.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973786
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:C07F15/00, C07F15/04, C07F15/06, C07F15/02, C08F32/08
[2000/04]
CPC:
C07F15/006 (EP); C07F15/0046 (EP); C07F15/0073 (EP);
C07F15/04 (EP); C07F15/06 (EP); C08F32/08 (EP);
C08G61/08 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:KATALYSATOR UND VERWENDUNG DES KATALYSATORS FÜR DIE POLYMERISATION[2000/04]
English:CATALYST AND USE OF CATALYSTS IN POLYMERISATION[2000/04]
French:CATALYSEUR ET SON UTILISATION POUR LA POLYMERISATION[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase11.11.1999National basic fee paid 
11.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
13.04.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/24]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US5569730  (GOODALL, B.L. ET AL.) [A] 1-11 * column W *;
 [A]DE4447066  (HOECHST AG) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [PX]  - HEINZ, B. S. ET AL, "Poly(norbornene carboxylic acid ester). Synthesis and properties", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19971201), vol. 127, no. 22, Database accession no. 307733, XP002075149 [PX] 1-11 * abstract *
 [T]  - HEINZ, BEATE S. ET AL, "Pd(II)-catalyzed vinylic polymerization of norbornene and copolymerization with norbornene carboxylic acid esters", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 129, Database accession no. 68084, XP002075150 [T] 1-11 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.