EP0981925 - A METHOD FOR PACKET SWITCHED DATA TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIPPELÄINEN, Leo Sysimiehenpolku 8 E FIN-00670 Helsinki / FI | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani, et al Kolster Oy Ab,P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98921511.6 | 12.05.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998FI00401 | Priority number, date | FI19970002039 | 13.05.1997 Original published format: FI 972039 | [2000/09] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9852327 | Date: | 19.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0981925 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04L12/56, H04Q7/22 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
H04W72/535 (EP);
H04W84/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PAKETVERMITTELTEN DATENÜBERTRAGUNG | [2000/09] | English: | A METHOD FOR PACKET SWITCHED DATA TRANSMISSION | [2000/09] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES COMMUTEE PAR PAQUETS | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1998 | Translation filed | 29.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 29.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 02.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/24] | 07.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4980886 (BERNSTEIN SIMON [US]); | [Y]US5229992 (JURKEVICH MARK [US], et al); | [Y]GB2278978 (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB]); | [Y]WO9520283 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [Y]WO9618248 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [Y]US5559796 (EDEM BRIAN C [US], et al) |