blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0983768

EP0983768 - MEDICINAL COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTION OR TREATMENT OF HEPATOPATHY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.06.2001 [2001/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Shinyaku Co., Ltd.
14, Kisshoin Nishinosho Monguchicho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 601-8550 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
Nippon Shinyaku Co., Ltd.
14, Kisshoin-Nishinosho-Monguchicho, Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8550 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OZAKI, Takayuki
464, Harimadacho
Moriyama-shi, Shiga 524-0012 / JP
02 / HIRATA, Yoshihisa
Lappo Nagaokakyo 106,15, Okukaiinji Takenoshita
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-0853 / JP
03 / TADA, Shin-ichi
1691-103, Mabuchicho
Ohmihachiman-shi, Shiga 523-0022 / JP
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, et al
Hansmann & Vogeser
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, Dr., et al
Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
Application number, filing date98921742.720.05.1998
[2000/10]
WO1998JP02223
Priority number, dateJP1997013348023.05.1997         Original published format: JP 13348097
JP1997019255517.07.1997         Original published format: JP 19255597
[2000/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9852611
Date:26.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0983768
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.11.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61K45/00, A61K31/70, A61K31/44
[2000/10]
CPC:
A61K31/7076 (EP); A61K31/52 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/10]
TitleGerman:ARZNEIMITTEL ZUR VORBEUGUNG BZW. ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LEBERLEIDEN[2000/10]
English:MEDICINAL COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTION OR TREATMENT OF HEPATOPATHY[2000/10]
French:PREPARATION MEDICAMENTEUSE AUX FINS DE LA PREVENTION ET DU TRAITEMENT DES HEPATOPATHIES[2000/10]
Entry into regional phase25.11.1999Translation filed 
25.11.1999National basic fee paid 
25.11.1999Search fee paid 
25.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
25.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/10]
01.12.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/26]
19.01.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/26]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH03167197
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.