EP0921262 - CLOSURE MEMBER AND CLOSING CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD. 3-4-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Nisshin A & C Co., Ltd. 1-12, Minato 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0043 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD. 3-4-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Nisshin A & C Co., Ltd. 1-12, Minato 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUSAWA, Hidetoshi-Nisshin A & C Co., Ltd. 1-12, Minato 1-chome,Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0043 / JP | [1999/23] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/23] | Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98921800.3 | 26.05.1998 | [1999/23] | WO1998JP02289 | Priority number, date | JP19970183101 | 24.06.1997 Original published format: JP 18310197 | [1999/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9859142 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0921262 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E06B5/00 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
E06B11/00 (EP,US);
E06B3/80 (EP,US);
E06B5/00 (EP,US);
E06B7/084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/23] | Title | German: | SCHLIESSELEMENT UND SCHLIESSKONSTRUKTION | [1999/23] | English: | CLOSURE MEMBER AND CLOSING CONSTRUCTION | [1999/23] | French: | ELEMENT ET STRUCTURE DE FERMETURE | [1999/23] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1999 | Translation filed | 20.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 20.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 26.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/21] | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3115182 (BOBBITT EUGENE F) [X] 1 * column W *; | [A]FR2252793 (KLEIN ETS GEORGES [FR]) [A] 1,4 * page 3, line 2 - page 5, line 40; figure - *; | [A]JPH06135383 ; | [A]GB751591 (VIBRANE CORP) [A] 1,2,4 * page 1, line 11 - line 49 * * page 1, line 90 - page 2, line 45 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 68; figures 1-7 *; | [A]GB1079548 (MARIO BALLESTRA) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 34 - line 68 * * page 2, line 6 - line 19 * * page 2, line 56 - line 115 * * figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940817), vol. 018, no. 440, Database accession no. (M - 1657), & JP06135383 A 19940517 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH0633663 (OKUMURA CORP) |