Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9963215 | Global Dossier | 09.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9802392 | 29.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1865180 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9802392 | 29.05.1998 | EP98921891 | 29.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1001155 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2006 | A4 | EP1001155 | 17.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9802392 | 29.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6467337 | 22.10.2002 | B2 | US2002032540 | 14.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9802392 | 29.05.1998 | US40266299 | 08.10.1999 | Type | Divisional application | EP1865180 |