EP1040053 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MIXING AND DISPERSING MULTIPART SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/40] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MIXING AND DISPERSING MULTIPART SOLUTIONS | ||
[2002/12] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLETTE, Russell, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
KUBICEK, Brian, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/40] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98922143.7 | 07.05.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998US09406 | Priority number, date | US19970987174 | 08.12.1997 Original published format: US 987174 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9929590 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040053 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/32, C11D3/00 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
C11D7/06 (EP,US);
B05B11/0078 (EP,US);
B05B11/026 (EP,US);
B65D81/3266 (EP,US);
C11D17/041 (EP,US);
C11D3/0031 (EP,US);
C11D3/3947 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/40] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM MISCHEN UND AUSGEBEN VON MEHRKOMPONENTENLÖSUNGEN | [2002/12] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MIXING AND DISPERSING MULTIPART SOLUTIONS | [2002/12] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE MELANGE ET DE DISPERSION DE SOLUTIONS DE CONSTITUANTS MULTIPLES | [2002/12] |
Former [2000/40] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM MISCHEN UND AUSGEBEN VON MEHRKOMPONENTENLÖSUNGEN | ||
Former [2000/40] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MIXING AND DISPERSING MULTIPART SOLUTIONS | ||
Former [2000/40] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE MELANGE ET DE DISPERSION DE SOLUTIONS DE CONSTITUANTS MULTIPLES | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/12] | 27.10.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US2932385 (WAYNE BOLLMEIER EMIL, et al) [DY] 5-7,13 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 74; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3294227 (SCHNEIDER WILLIAM S, et al) [A] 2-4 * column 4, line 53 - column 7, line 57; figure -; claim 1 *; | [Y]US3339716 (JAMES TAYLOR NEIL) [Y] 26 * column 3, line 9 - line 28; figure 3 *; | [A]US3805991 (CHELADZE G, et al) [A] 11 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2134067 (BARD INC C R) [Y] 14 * page 1, line 111 - page 2, line 90; figure - *; | [A]US4732299 (HOYT EARL E [US]) [A] 10 * figures 1,2,15 *; | [XY]EP0345774 (SHINSOZAI SOGO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,8-12,15,23-25 * page 4, line 14 - line 43 * * page 5, line 31 - line 58; figure - * [Y] 5-7,13,14,16-22,26-30; | [A]EP0346835 (BASF CORP [US]) [A] 16-22,27-30 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 57 *; | [A]US5337921 (WILSON DANIEL C [US], et al) [A] 12,24,25 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US5338475 (COREY GARLAND P [US], et al) [A] 16-22,27-30 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 59 * * column 7, line 1 - line 55 *; | [DY]US5389278 (MINNS CHARLES R [US], et al) [DY] 16-22,27-30 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 40 * * claim - *; | [PA]US5728669 (TYERECH MICHAEL RICHARD [US]) [PA] 16-22,27-30 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 46 ** column 6, line 42 - column 8, line 5 * |