EP0981734 - FLUORESCENCE SENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/09] | IMPROVED FLUORESCENCE SENSING DEVICE | ||
[2002/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colvin, Arthur E., Jr. 12321 Middlebrook Road Germantown, MD 20874 / US | [2000/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98922205.4 | 12.05.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998US09589 | Priority number, date | US19970855236 | 13.05.1997 Original published format: US 855236 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9852023 | Date: | 19.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981734 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0981734 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N21/77 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
G01N21/6454 (EP,US);
G01N21/64 (KR);
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
G01N21/7703 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6484 (EP,US);
G01N2201/0833 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR FLUORESZENZNACHWEIS | [2002/26] | English: | FLUORESCENCE SENSING DEVICE | [2002/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF CAPTEUR A FLUORESCENCE | [2002/26] |
Former [2000/09] | VERBESSERTE VORRICHTUNG FÜR FLUORESZENZNACHWEIS | ||
Former [2000/09] | IMPROVED FLUORESCENCE SENSING DEVICE | ||
Former [2000/09] | DISPOSITIF CAPTEUR A FLUORESCENCE AMELIORE | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 01.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4389670 (DAVIDSON JACKSON B, et al) [Y] 1,4-7,10,12-16,19* column 6, line 28 - line 68; figure 3 *; | [DY]US5517313 (COLVIN ARTHUR E JR [US]) [DY] 1,4-7,10,12-16,19 * the whole document *; | [DYA] - COLVIN A E JR ET AL, "A novel solid-state oxygen sensor", JOHNS HOPKINS APL TECHNICAL DIGEST, OCT.-DEC. 1996, JOHNS HOPKINS UNIV. APPL. PHYS. LAB, USA, ISSN 0270-5214, vol. 17, no. 4, pages 377 - 385, XP002071761 [DY] 1,4-7,10,12-16 * page 398, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 379, column L, paragraph 2 - page 380, column L, paragraph 2; figures 2,3 * [A] 19 | Examination | - TRIGG G.L., Encyclopedia of Applied Physics, Volume 6, WEINHEIM, VCH, (1993), ICS |