EP0981578 - AROMATIC POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION FOR MOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARMER, Jerome, F. 8 Longwood Drive Loudonville, NY 12211 / US | 02 /
STODDARD, Gregory, James Ansjovislaan 3 NL-4617 AN Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr., et al London Patent Operation, GE International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98922316.9 | 15.05.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998US09950 | Priority number, date | USP 46568 | 15.05.1997 | USA 79705 | 15.05.1998 | [2000/16] |
Former [2000/16] | US19970046568P | 15.05.1997 | |
[2000/09] | 14.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/09] | USP 46568 | 15.05.1997 | |
USA | 15.05.1998 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9851737 | Date: | 19.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981578 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/34, C08L69/00, C08L51/04 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
C08L69/00 (KR);
C08K3/013 (KR);
C08K3/22 (KR);
C08K3/34 (KR);
C08L25/10 (KR);
C08L51/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [2000/09] | Title | German: | AROMATISCHE POLYCARBONAT-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR FORMMASSEN | [2000/09] | English: | AROMATIC POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION FOR MOLDING | [2000/09] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINES AROMATIQUES DE POLYCARBONATE DESTINEES AU MOULAGE | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/22] | 30.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0135904 (MOBAY CHEMICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 20 - page 7, line 45; examples 1-7; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]US4937287 (DEAN BARRY D [US]) [Y] 5* column 16, lines 50-55 *; | [XY]US5091461 (SKOCHDOPOLE RICHARD E [US]) [X] 1-10 * examples RUN,5-13; claims 1,4-9 * [Y] 5; | [XD]US5162419 (POTTIER-METZ CATHERINE M M [FR], et al) [XD] 1-7,10 * example EXAMPLES; claims 1-20 * |