EP0983671 - INTERNET-BASED SUBSCRIBER PROFILE MANAGEMENT OF A COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MCI Worldcom, Inc. 515 East Amite Street Jackson, MS 39201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states MCI Worldcom, Inc. 515 East Amite Street Jackson, MS 39201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, James, Allen 105 Hames Street S.W. Cedar Rapids, IA 52404 / US | 02 /
VAIDYA, Ramchandra, S. Unit C 2830 Towne House Drive N.E. Cedar Rapids, IA 52402-7082 / US | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 10a 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Herzogspitalstrasse 10a 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/10] | Rupp, Christian, Dipl.Phys., et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98922428.2 | 15.05.1998 | [2000/10] | WO1998US10227 | Priority number, date | US19970862134 | 22.05.1997 Original published format: US 862134 | US19970925370 | 08.09.1997 Original published format: US 925370 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9853582 | Date: | 26.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0983671 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04M3/42 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04L12/2856 (EP);
H04L63/101 (EP);
H04M3/4228 (EP);
H04Q11/0435 (EP);
H04Q3/0033 (EP);
H04M7/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/10] | Title | German: | PERSONALDATENVERWALTUNG EINES DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEMS AUF INTERNETBASIS | [2000/10] | English: | INTERNET-BASED SUBSCRIBER PROFILE MANAGEMENT OF A COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2000/10] | French: | GESTION DE PROFIL D'ABONNE PAR INTERNET DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS | [2000/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 01.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/27] | 24.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PXY]WO9723988 (HARRIS STEPHEN ;BRITISH TELECOMM (GB)) [PX] 1-11,13,15-21,23-30,32-35,37-39 * abstract * * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 6 * * page 2, line 13 - line 15 * * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 4 * * page 3, line 12 - line 14 * * page 11, line 25 - line 29 * [Y] 12,14,22,31,36; | [Y] - ANDERSON S ET AL, "Sessioneer: flexible session level authentication with off the shelf servers and clients", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, (199504), vol. 27, no. 6, page 1047-1053, XP004013206 [Y] 12,14,22,31,36 * abstract * * page 1049, column R, line 9 - line 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(95)00040-E |