Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU727622B | Global Dossier | 14.12.2000 | B2 | AU7512698 | 11.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | AU7512698 | 21.05.1998 | AUPO692897 | 21.05.1997 | AU9800377 | 21.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0986437 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2008 | B1 | EP0986437 | 21.04.2004 | A4 | EP0986437 | 22.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPO692897 | 21.05.1997 | AU9800377 | 21.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2291183 | 31.07.2007 | C | CA2291183 | 26.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPO692897 | 21.05.1997 | AU9800377 | 21.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69839730D1 | 28.08.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AUPO692897 | 21.05.1997 | AU9800377 | 21.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ501244 | 25.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPO692897 | 21.05.1997 | AU9800377 | 21.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6299034 | 09.10.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | AUPO692897 | 21.05.1997 | AU9800377 | 21.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9852696 | Global Dossier | 26.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPO692897 | 21.05.1997 |