EP0986437 - DISPENSER OUTLET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tancheff, Brian 15 Broadbeach Road Cape Woolamai, VIC 3925 / AU | [2000/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Unwin, Stephen Geoffrey Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Unwin, Stephen Geoffrey Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/12] | Unwin, Stephen Geoffrey Fry Heath & Spence, The Old College, 53 High Street Horley, Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98922509.9 | 21.05.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998AU00377 | Priority number, date | AU1997PO06928 | 21.05.1997 Original published format: AU PO692897 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9852696 | Date: | 26.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986437 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986437 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/02, B65D83/76 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
B05C17/00516 (EP,US);
B05C17/00596 (EP);
B05C17/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/12] | Title | German: | SPENDERAUSLASS | [2000/12] | English: | DISPENSER OUTLET | [2000/12] | French: | SORTIE DE DISTRIBUTEUR | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 19.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 16.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 16.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.07.2008 | NL | 16.07.2008 | ES | 27.10.2008 | [2010/05] |
Former [2009/09] | NL | 16.07.2008 | |
ES | 27.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]AU462949B ; | [X]FR2622814 (COLLARD CATHERINE [FR]); | [X]DE4005350 (WAGNER INT [CH]); | [Y]GB2299529 (INCRO LTD [GB]); | [XP]WO9815386 (SAECHSISCHE WERKZEUG UND SONDE [DE], et al) |