blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0975743

EP0975743 - INHIBITORS FOR UROKINASE RECEPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.12.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.02.2006  [2006/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 112-132
68305 Mannheim / DE
[2005/18]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KESSLER, Horst
Friedrich-Stolze-Strasse 53
D-65824 Schwalbach / DE
02 / GRAEFF, Heinrich
Josef-Schwarz-Weg 11
D-81479 München / DE
03 / SCHMITT, Manfred
Hohenaschauer Strasse 10
D-81669 München / DE
04 / MAGDOLEN, Viktor
Moosachweg 3
D-85551 Kirchheim / DE
05 / WILHELM, Olaf, G.
Säbener Strasse 188
D-81545 München / DE
06 / RIEMER, Christoph
Prinzregentenstrasse 139
D-81677 München / DE
07 / BÜRGLE, Markus
Ötschmannweg 10
D-81369 München / DE
08 / KOPPITZ, Marcus, Schering AG
Pharmazeutische Chemie IV, Abt. Peptidchemie
D-13342 Berlin / DE
09 / KÖNIG, Bernhard
Dürrbergstrasse 28
D-82335 Berg / DE
10 / WEIDLE, Ulrich
Landwehrstrasse 56
D-80336 München / DE
[2000/05]
Application number, filing date98922709.514.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998EP02178
Priority number, dateEP1997010602411.04.1997         Original published format: EP 97106024
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9846731
Date:22.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975743
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:C12N9/72, C07K7/06, A61K38/49, A61K38/04
[2000/05]
CPC:
C12N9/6462 (EP,US); A61P19/10 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP); A61P35/04 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP); A61P9/10 (EP); C12Y304/21073 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/05]
TitleGerman:INHIBITOREN FÜR DEN UROKINASEREZEPTOR[2000/05]
English:INHIBITORS FOR UROKINASE RECEPTOR[2000/05]
French:INHIBITEURS POUR LE RECEPTEUR DE L'UROKINASE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase11.11.1999National basic fee paid 
11.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
06.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/07]
13.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9422464  (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * page 1 - page 2; claims 1-14 *;
 [DY]  - V.MAGDOLEN ET AL., "Systematic mutational analysis of the receptor- binding region of the human urokinase- type plasminogen activator", EUR.J.BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 237, pages 237 - 51, XP000652373 [DY] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1996.0743p.x
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.