EP0983385 - PREDICTION OF INFLAMMATORY DISEASE ASSOCIATED WITH IL-1 GENELOCI POLYMORPHISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interleukin Genetics, Inc. 135 Beaver Street Waltham, MA 02452 / US | [2004/36] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states Duff, Gordon 18 Ashgate Road Sheffield S10 3BZ / GB | ||
For all designated states Cox, Angela 2 Melbourn Road Crookes, Sheffield S10 1NS / GB | |||
For all designated states Camp, Nicola, Jane 26 Wynyard Road Hillsborough, Sheffield / GB | |||
For all designated states De Giovine, Francesco, Saverio 3 Tetney Road Ranmoor, Sheffield S10 3GZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duff, Gordon 18 Ashgate Road Sheffield S10 3BZ / GB | 02 /
Cox, Angela 2 Melbourn Road Crookes, Sheffield S10 1NS / GB | 03 /
Camp, Nicola, Jane 26 Wynyard Road Hillsbourough, Sheffield / GB | 04 /
De Giovine, Francesco, Saverio 3 Tetney Road Ranmoor, Sheffield S10 3GZ / GB | [2010/13] |
Former [2004/36] | 01 /
Duff, Gordon 18 Ashgate Road Sheffield S10 3BZ / GB | ||
02 /
Cox, Angela 2 Melbourn Road Crooks, Sheffield S10 1NS / GB | |||
03 /
Camp, Nicola, Jane 26 Wynyard Road Hillsbourough, Sheffield / GB | |||
04 /
De Giovine, Francesco, Saverio 3 Tetney Road Ranmoor, Sheffield S10 3GZ / GB | |||
Former [2000/10] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2000/10] | Horner, Martin Grenville Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 98922938.0 | 21.05.1998 | [2000/10] | WO1998GB01481 | Priority number, date | GB19970011040 | 29.05.1997 Original published format: GB 9711040 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9854359 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0983385 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0983385 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
G01N33/502 (EP,US);
G01N33/5091 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/172 (EP,US);
Y10T436/143333 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] | Title | German: | VORHERSAGE VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN KRANKEITEN ASSOZIERT MIT IL-1 GENLOCUS POLYMORPHISMEN | [2000/10] | English: | PREDICTION OF INFLAMMATORY DISEASE ASSOCIATED WITH IL-1 GENELOCI POLYMORPHISMS | [2000/10] | French: | PREDICTION D'UNE MALADIE INFLAMMATOIRE ASSOCIEE AUX POLYMORPHISMES DES LOCI SUR LE GENE DE L'IL-1 | [2000/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 18.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 30.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2003 | 31.05.2005 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   03.06.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | CY | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | NL | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | IE | 21.05.2010 | LU | 21.05.2010 | CH | 31.05.2010 | LI | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 21.05.2010 | ||
LU | 21.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 21.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [PA]WO9738135 (MEDICAL SCIENCE SYS INC [US]) [PA] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9743446 (GEMINI INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS [MC], et al) [PA] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9815653 (DUFF GORDON [GB], et al) [PA] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [XD] - MCDOWELL T.L. ET AL.,, "A gentic association between juvenile rheumatoid arthritis and a novel interleukin-1 alpha polymorphism", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, vol. 38, no. 2, pages 221 - 228, XP002077314 [XD] 1-27 * see whole doc. esp primers page 222 * | [XD] - DI GIOVINE F.S. ET AL.,, "Single base polymorphism at -511 in the human interleukin-1beta gene (IL1beta)", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, vol. 1, no. 6, page 450, XP002077315 [XD] 1-27 * the whole document * | [XD] - CLAY F. E. ET AL.,, "Novel interleukin-1 receptor antagonist exon polymorphisms and their use in allele-specific mRNA assessment", HUM. GENET., vol. 97, pages 723 - 726, XP002077312 [XD] 1-27 * the whole document * | [A] - EPPLEN C. ET AL.,, "Dinucleotide repeat polymorphism in the human IL1A gene", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, vol. 3, no. 9, page 1710, XP002077310 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * | [A] - GUASCH J. F. ET AL.,, "Five novel intragenic dimorphisms in the human interleukin-1 genes combine to high informativity", CYTOKINE, vol. 8, no. 8, pages 598 - 602, XP002077311 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * | [A] - BAILLY S. ET AL.,, "Genetic polymorphism of human interleukin-1alpha", EUR. J. IMMUNOL., vol. 23, pages 1240 - 1245, XP002077313 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * | [AD] - TODD S. & NAYLOR S.L., "Dinucleotide repeat polymorphism in the human interleukin 1, alpha gene (IL1A)", NUCLEICS ACIDS RESEARCH, vol. 19, no. 13, page 373756, XP002077341 [AD] 1-27 * the whole document * | [PX] - COX A. ET AL.,, "AN analysis of linkage disequilibrium in the interleukin-1 gene cluster, using a novel grouping method for multiallelic markers", AM. J. HUM. GENET., vol. 62, pages 1180 - 1188, XP002077316 [PX] 1-27 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5686246 | WO9815653 | - BLAKEMORE ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1994), vol. 37, pages 1380 - 85 | - BLAKEMORE ET AL., J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOL., (1995), vol. 80, no. 1, pages 111 - 5 | - MANSFIELD ET AL., GASTOENTEROL., (1994), vol. 106, no. 3, pages 637 - 42 | - CLAY ET AL., HUM. GENET., (1994), vol. 94, pages 407 - 10 | - DI GIOVINE ET AL., CYTOKINE, (1995), vol. 7, page 606 | - MCDOWELL ET AL., ARTHRITIS.RHEUM., (1995), vol. 38, pages 221 - 28 | - TARLOW JW ET AL., J. OF INVEST. DERMATOL., (1994), vol. 103, pages 387 - 389 | - POCIOT ET AL., EUR J. CLIN. INVEST., (1992), vol. 22, pages 396 - 402 |