23.09.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] |
30.07.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.06.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.04.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] |
21.12.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.09.2004 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
25.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.04.2004 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
28.02.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.12.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.08.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.08.2003 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
06.08.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.06.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
31.01.2003 |
First examination report |
|
24.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.07.2000 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] |
21.06.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.03.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] |
17.03.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] |
14.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
01.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.04.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
01.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|