EP0981606 - METHOD AND CONSTRUCT FOR INHIBITION OF CELL MIGRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states NEDERLANDSE ORGANISATIE VOOR TOEGEPAST-NATUURWETENSCHAPPELIJK ONDERZOEK TNO Schoemakerstraat 97, P.O. Box 60680 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUAX, Paulus, Hubertus, Andreas Jacob van Heemskercklaan 59 NL-2253 JX Voorschoten / NL | 02 /
VERHEIJEN, Johan, Hendrikus Verdistraat 14 NL-2651 VB Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2000/09] | Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 98923197.2 | 11.05.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998NL00259 | Priority number, date | EP19970201423 | 12.05.1997 Original published format: EP 97201423 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9851788 | Date: | 19.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0981606 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/72, C12N15/62, C07K14/81 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
C12N9/6459 (EP);
C07K14/485 (EP);
C07K14/8114 (EP);
C07K14/8117 (EP);
C07K14/8146 (EP);
C12Y304/21069 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VEKTOR ZUR HEMMUNG DER ZELL-MIGRATION | [2000/09] | English: | METHOD AND CONSTRUCT FOR INHIBITION OF CELL MIGRATION | [2000/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET CONSTRUCTION POUVANT INHIBER UNE MIGRATION CELLULAIRE | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 02.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/24] | 11.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9634009 (RUTGERS THE STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW JERSEY) [X] 1,13-15,18,19 * page 10, line 10 - page 20, line 2 *; | [X]WO9112328 (FOWLKES DANA M ET AL) [X] 1 * the whole document, esp. page 1-2 and page 28, line 20 - page 39, line 26 *; | [X]WO9623814 (CELL GENESYS INC) [X] 1,18 * page 9 - page 10 *; | [X]EP0383599 (MERCK & CO INC) [X] 1-3,6,19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9528955 (GLIEMANN JOERGEN ET AL) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9511987 (INCYTE PHARMA INC) [A] 1-5,7,18,19 * page 25, line 4 - page 27, line 13 * * page 85, line 10 - page 87, line 17 *; | [DA]WO9202553 (DELTA BIOTECHNOLOGY LTD) [DA] 1-5,7,8,11,18 * page 3, line 10 - page 9, line 1 *; | [XA]WO9517885 (RUTGERS , THE STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW JERSEY) [X] 1,7,8 * page 7, line 7 - line 10 * * page 15, line 1 - page 23, line 36 * * page 32, line 1 - page 34, line 6 * [A] 2-5; | [DPX]WO9725422 (NISSIN FOOD PRODUCTS LTD) [DPX] 1-5,7 * abstract *; | [X]EP0439954 (SERAGEN INC) [X] 1,6 * page 1 - page 4 *; | [X]WO9700949 (MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1,6 * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 6 * * page 12, line 26 - page 13, line 17 *; | [X]US5504001 (FOSTER DONALD C) [X] 1,6 * column 3, line 5 - line 55 *; | [A]WO8809344 (CREATIVE BIOMOLECULES INC) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]WO9513091 (INTERNATIONAL TECHNOLOGY MANAGEMENT ASS) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0404750 (WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY) [A] 8,12 * abstract *; | [A]WO9521601 (PROTEIN ENGINEERING CORP.) [A] 8,12 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 24 *; | [A]EP0623676 (AMGEN INC) [A] 1,8,12 * page 1 - page 4 * | [PX] - QUAX P H A ET AL, "Inhibition of neointima formation in cultured human saphenous vein segments by an adenovirus expressing an urokinase receptor binding plasmin inhibitor", CIRCULATION, us, (19971021), vol. 96, no. 8-Suppl., page I669, XP002084540 [PX] 1-5,13-15,18,19 * see abstract nr.: 3741 * |