blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1037804

EP1037804 - BINDING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valmet Fibertech Aktiebolag
851 94 Sundsvall / SE
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / EDSTRÖM, Tomas
Vedettb tsvägen 11
S-865 51 Ankarsvik / SE
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Sundqvist, Hans
Valmet Fibertech AB
Patents Department
851 94 Sundsvall / SE
[N/P]
Former [2009/40]Sundqvist, Hans
Valmet Fibertech AB Patents Department
851 94 Sundsvall / SE
Former [2000/39]Sundqvist, Hans
Valmet Eibertech AB, Patents Department
85194 Sundsvall / SE
Application number, filing date98923288.920.05.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998SE00941
Priority number, dateSE1997000240623.06.1997         Original published format: SE 9702406
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9858843
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037804
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037804
Date:10.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE30.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:B65B57/02, G01B3/12
[2000/39]
CPC:
G01B21/06 (EP,US); B65B13/04 (EP,US); B65B13/18 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FI,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:BINDEVORRICHTUNG[2004/22]
English:BINDING MEANS[2000/39]
French:MOYEN D'ATTACHE[2000/39]
Former [2000/39]BINDEMITTEL
Entry into regional phase20.03.2000National basic fee paid 
20.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
20.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
20.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2004Fee for grant paid
10.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
21.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.03.2000CH   M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2000
02.03.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2000
02.03.2000FI   M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2000
02.03.2000NL   M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2000
02.03.2000SE   M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2000
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
02.03.2000M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2000
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]GB1388385  (SMITHS INDUSTRIES LTD);
 [A]US5177446  (BORIANI SILVANO [IT], et al);
 [A]US5299407  (SCHUTTLER KARL H [DE], et al)
ExaminationUS4754593
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.