18.09.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] |
29.06.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.05.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.02.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.10.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.06.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.04.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.01.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.09.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.06.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.02.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] |
07.02.2003 |
First examination report |
|
05.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.09.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
21.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.06.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
16.06.2000 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] |
14.01.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] |
14.01.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] |
17.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|