Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002513449 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9810385 | 22.05.1998 | US86261297 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU733819B | Global Dossier | 24.05.2001 | B2 | AU7586298 | 11.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9810385 | 22.05.1998 | US86261297 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0981666 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9810385 | 22.05.1998 | US86261297 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9809136 | 04.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9810385 | 22.05.1998 | US86261297 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2291172 | 15.04.2008 | C | CA2291172 | 26.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9810385 | 22.05.1998 | US86261297 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO995734L | 24.01.2000 | L | NO995734D0 | 22.11.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US9810385 | 22.05.1998 | US86261297 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ501695 | 25.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US9810385 | 22.05.1998 | US86261297 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9853141 | Global Dossier | 26.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86261297 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010012917 | 26.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US86261297 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6183814 | 06.02.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US86261297 | 23.05.1997 |