EP0981666 - POLYLACTIDE COATED PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARGILL, INCORPORATED 15407 McGinty Road West Minneapolis, MN 55391-2399 / US | [2000/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NANGERONI, James, Francis 16 Charter Circle Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | 02 /
HARTMANN, Mark, H. 5474 Sanibel Drive Minnetonka, MN 55343 / US | 03 /
IWEN, Matthew, L. c/o Rexam 8235 220th Street West Lakeville, Minnesota 55044 / US | 04 /
RYAN, Christopher, M. 9186 Quinwood Lane North Maple Grove, MN 55369 / US | 05 /
KOLSTAD, Jeffrey, J. 16122 Ringer Road Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | 06 /
McCARTHY, Kevin, T. 8412 1st Avenue South Bloomington, MN 55420 / US | [2000/31] |
Former [2000/09] | 01 /
NANGERONI, James, Francis 16 Charter Circle Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | ||
02 /
HARTMANN, Mark, H. 5474 Sanibel Drive Minnetonka, MN 55343 / US | |||
03 /
IWEN, Matthew, L. 6311 Thomas Avenue South Richfield, MN 55423 / US | |||
04 /
RYAN, Christopher, M. 9186 Quinwood Lane North Maple Grove, MN 55369 / US | |||
05 /
KOLSTAD, Jeffrey, J. 16122 Ringer Road Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | |||
06 /
McCARTHY, Kevin, T. 8412 1st Avenue South Bloomington, MN 55420 / US | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2000/09] | Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 98923608.8 | 22.05.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998US10385 | Priority number, date | US19970862612 | 23.05.1997 Original published format: US 862612 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9853141 | Date: | 26.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981666 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D21H19/28, C09D167/04, // D21H23:46 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
C09D167/04 (EP,US);
D21H19/28 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/912 (EP,US);
D21H23/46 (EP,US);
D21H27/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3179 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | MIT POLYLACTIDEN BESCHICHTETES PAPIER | [2000/09] | English: | POLYLACTIDE COATED PAPER | [2000/09] | French: | PAPIER ENDUIT DE POLYLACTIDE | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 10.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.2000 | 31.05.2009 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5359026 (GRUBER PATRICK R [US], et al); | [AD]US5142023 (GRUBER PATRICK R [US], et al); | [A]EP0699800 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]); | [AD]US5594095 (GRUBER PATRICK R [US], et al); | [A]WO9408090 (CARGILL INC [US]) |