EP0984679 - LIGHTWEIGHT TRANSPONDER TAG FOR SMALL ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Destron Fearing Corporation 490 East Villaume Avenue South St. Paul, MN 55075 / US | [2000/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, George, N. 612 Pine Tree Trail Stillwater, MN 55082 / US | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Wittrup, Flemming Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Wittrup, Flemming Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2000/11] | Wittrup, Flemming Hofman-Bang A/S, Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 98923609.6 | 22.05.1998 | [2000/11] | WO1998US10386 | Priority number, date | US19970861885 | 22.05.1997 Original published format: US 861885 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9852406 | Date: | 26.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0984679 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01K11/00 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
A01K11/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [2000/11] | Title | German: | LEICHTGEWICHT TRANSPONDERETIKETTE FÜR KLEINE TIERE | [2000/11] | English: | LIGHTWEIGHT TRANSPONDER TAG FOR SMALL ANIMALS | [2000/11] | French: | ETIQUETTE LEGERE A TRANSPONDEUR POUR PETITS ANIMAUX | [2000/11] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 02.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/12] | 18.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.10.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]BE1006747 (SPLITTHOFF JOSEF [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * [A] 8,10,12-17,19,20; | [YA]FR2442583 (VILLA MASSONE RENE) [Y] 1-7 * page 5, lines 1-3; figure 1 * [A] 9,18; | [A]WO9202127 (ALFA LAVAL AGRI INT [SE]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | by applicant | US5461807 | US5211129 |