Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0986554
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.06.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] |
25.06.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] |
10.03.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.09.2003 |
First examination report |
|
23.09.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.06.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.02.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] |
04.02.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] |
01.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
01.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|