Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3267632B | Global Dossier | 18.03.2002 | B2 | JP2000513747 | 17.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | US9810633 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU730245B | Global Dossier | 01.03.2001 | B2 | AU7595998 | 30.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | US9810633 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0986554 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | US9810633 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BG103923 | 30.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | US9810633 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9809498 | 20.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | US9810633 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2291086 | 03.12.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | US9810633 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO4940492 | 24.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA199901095 | 28.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | US9810633 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EE9900543A | 15.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | US9810633 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9714320D0 | 10.09.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0004621 | 29.04.2002 | A3 | HUP0004621 | 28.03.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | US9810633 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IS5240 | 09.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | US9810633 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO995822L | 28.01.2000 | L | NO995822D0 | 26.11.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | US9810633 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK163299 | 11.07.2000 | A3 | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | US9810633 | 26.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6071916 | 06.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US8602198 | 28.05.1998 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA984514 | 30.11.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9854178 | Global Dossier | 03.12.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR015688 | 16.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1257497 | 21.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP980283 | 31.08.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID23858A | 25.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010013042 | 26.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE75099 | 11.08.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL336847 | 17.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR199902816T | 21.02.2000 | T2 | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW438799B | 07.06.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | GB9714320 | 07.07.1997 | US4795097 | 29.05.1997 |