EP0986554 - SULFATE SALT OF AN HIV PROTEASE INHIBITOR HAVING AN IMPROVED ORAL ABSORPTION AND BIOAVAILABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. (a New Jersey corp.) 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, N.J. 07065 / US | [2000/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASKIN, David 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 02 /
HOERRNER, R., Scott 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 03 /
PURICK, Robert, M. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 04 /
REIDER, Paul 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 05 /
VARSOLONA, Richard, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 06 /
VOLANTE, Ralph, P. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road, Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [2000/12] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98923741.7 | 26.05.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998US10633 | Priority number, date | US19970047950P | 29.05.1997 Original published format: US 47950 P | GB19970014320 | 07.07.1997 Original published format: GB 9714320 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9854178 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986554 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/06, A61K31/495, A61K31/34 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
C07D405/06 (EP,KR);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/12] | Extension states | LT | 29.12.1999 | LV | 29.12.1999 | RO | 29.12.1999 | SI | 29.12.1999 | Title | German: | SULFATSALZ EINES HIV PROTEASE INHIBITORS MIT VERBESSERTER ORALER ABSORPTION UND BIOVERFÜGBARKEIT | [2000/12] | English: | SULFATE SALT OF AN HIV PROTEASE INHIBITOR HAVING AN IMPROVED ORAL ABSORPTION AND BIOAVAILABILITY | [2000/12] | French: | SEL DE SULFATE D'UN INHIBITEUR DE PROTEASE DU VIH A ABSORPTION ORALE ET BIODISPONIBILITE AMELIOREES | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 25.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/33] | 12.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO9516688 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [DX] 1-25 * page 41 - page 44; example 3 ** page 8, line 1 - line 2 * |