blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0985104

EP0985104 - IMPROVEMENTS IN DISC BRAKE SHOE AND LINING ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.05.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2009Change - representativepublished on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meritor Heavy Vehicle Systems, LLC
2135 West Maple Road
Troy, MI 48084 / US
[2000/11]
Inventor(s)01 / KAY, Joseph, A.
826 North Hickory Ridge
Highland, MI 48357 / US
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Kitzhofer, Thomas, et al
Prinz & Partner GbR
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/42]Kitzhofer, Thomas, et al
Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Former [2000/11]Kitzhofer, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date98923747.426.05.1998
[2000/11]
WO1998US10642
Priority number, dateUS1997004839003.06.1997         Original published format: US 48390
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9855778
Date:10.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0985104
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:F16D65/092
[2000/11]
CPC:
F16D65/0974 (EP,US); F16D55/224 (EP,US); F16D65/092 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0091 (EP,US); F16D2065/026 (EP,US); F16D2121/02 (EP,US);
F16D2125/22 (EP,US); F16D2125/32 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2000/11]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN AN BREMSSCHUH-BELAGEINHEITEN[2000/11]
English:IMPROVEMENTS IN DISC BRAKE SHOE AND LINING ASSEMBLIES[2000/11]
French:AMELIORATIONS CONCERNANT LES ASSEMBLAGES DE SEMELLE ET DE REVETEMENT DE FREINS A DISQUES[2000/11]
Entry into regional phase02.12.1999National basic fee paid 
02.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/11]
28.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]GB1065267  (OTTO HILGER 71 WOLFGANG BUSCH, et al) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4823920  (EVANS ANTHONY C [US]) [X] 1-3* figure - *;
 [X]US5236068  (NAGAI STEVE S [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 44 - line 50; figures 3,5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.