EP1017411 - COMPOSITIONS SUITABLE FOR CONTROLLED RELEASE OF THE HORMONE GnRH AND ITS ANALOGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Durect Corporation 10240 Bubb Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2005/12] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states Southern Biosystems, Inc. 756 Tom Martin Drive Birmingham, AL 35211-4467 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNS, Patrick, J. 2368 Woodfield Circle Lexington, KY 40515 / US | 02 /
GIBSON, John, W. 4558 Washington Valley Road Springville, AL 35146 / US | 03 /
TIPTON, Arthur, J. 686 Summit Point Birmingham, AL 35226 / US | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Boff, James Charles Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Boff, James Charles Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98923763.1 | 26.05.1998 | [2000/28] | WO1998US10668 | Priority number, date | US19970047789P | 28.05.1997 Original published format: US 47789 P | US19970001123 | 30.12.1997 Original published format: US 1123 | [2000/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9853837 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1017411 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1017411 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/09, A61K47/26, A61P15/08 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61K38/09 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P15/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/28] | A61K38/02, A61K9/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/28] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN GEEIGNET ZUR KONTROLLIERTEN FREISETZUNG DES HORMONS GNRH UND DESSEN ANALOGA | [2000/28] | English: | COMPOSITIONS SUITABLE FOR CONTROLLED RELEASE OF THE HORMONE GnRH AND ITS ANALOGS | [2000/28] | French: | COMPOSITION ASSURANT LA LIBERATION REGULEE DE L'HORMONE GNRH ET DE SES ANALOGUES | [2000/28] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 17.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 16.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | CY | 30.11.2005 | FI | 30.11.2005 | NL | 30.11.2005 | DK | 28.02.2006 | GR | 28.02.2006 | SE | 28.02.2006 | PT | 02.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/16] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9116929 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * see abstract, page 6 lines 17-19, page 15 lines 1-3, claim 5 * [Y] 1-12; | [XY]EP0481732 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * see page 5, claims 15 and 23-24 * [Y] 1-12; | [Y]WO9639995 (SOUTHERN BIOSYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * see claims 1-6,11,16,38-46 and pages 25-26 *; | [X] - BURNS, P. ET AL, "Pharmacodynamic evaluation of the SABER delivery system for the controlled release of the GnRH analog deslorelin acetate for advancing ovulation in cyclic mares", PROC. INT. SYMP. CONTROLLED RELEASE BIOACT. MATER. (1997), 24TH, 737-738, XP002203242 [X] 1-12 * see the whole document * | [XY] - MATSUBARA K ET AL, "CONTROLLED RELEASE OF THE LHRH AGONIST BUSERELIN ACETATE FROM INJECTABLE SUSPENSIONS CONTAINING TRIACETYLATED CYCLODEXTRINS IN ANOIL VEHICLE", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19940901), vol. 31, no. 2, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 173 - 180, XP000458317 [X] 1,2,5,7 * see abstract and page 173 * [Y] 1-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(94)00030-1 | [Y] - GUNNET J W ET AL, "EFFECTS OF A SUSTAINED RELEASE FORMULATION OF THE GONADOTROPHIN-RELEASING HORME AGONIST HISTRELIN AND SERUM CONCENTRATIONS OF GONADOTROPHINS AND OESTRADIOL, AND OVARIAN LH/HUMAN CHORIONIC GONADOTROPHIN RECEPTOR CONTENT IN THE RAT", JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY, BRISTOL, GB, (1991), vol. 2, no. 131, ISSN 0022-0795, pages 211 - 218, XP001078783 [Y] 1-12 * see page 212 left col. * | [XY] - REEL J.R. ET AL., "Stimulation of LH release and ovulation in the rat by cutaneous application of luteinizing hormone-releasing hormone (LH-RH)in dimethyl sulfoxide (DMSO)", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1976), Database accession no. 1976:39108, XP002203243 [X] 1,2,4-7 * abstract * [Y] 1-12 | [ ] - ENDOCR. RES. COMMUN., (1975), vol. 2, no. 4-5, pages 327 - 333 | [XY] - BHATIA K.S. ET AL., "Percutaneous absorption of LHRH through porcine skin : effect of N-methyl 2-pyrrolidone and isopropyl myristate", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1997), Database accession no. 1997:641893, XP002203244 [X] 1,2,4-7 * abstract * [Y] 1-12 | [ ] - DRUG DEVELOPMENT AND INDUSTRIAL PHARMACY, (1997), vol. 23, no. 11, pages 1111 - 1114 | International search | [Y]US3992365 (BEDDELL CHRISTOPHER RAYMOND, et al); | [Y]US4411890 (MOMANY FRANK A [US]); | [Y]US5391381 (WONG PATRICK S L [US], et al); | [Y]US5545408 (TRIGG TIMOTHY E [AU], et al) |