EP0986802 - READING AND PRONUNCIATION TUTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARNEGIE MELLON UNIVERSITY 5000 Forbes Avenue Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15213 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states CARNEGIE MELLON UNIVERSITY 5000 Forbes Avenue Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15213 / US | ||
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states CARNEGIE MELLON UNIVERSITY 5000 Forbes Avenue Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15213 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOSTOW, Jack 54 Carleton Drive Mount Lebanon, PA 15243 / US | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98923869.6 | 01.06.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998US11088 | Priority number, date | US19970863505 | 02.06.1997 Original published format: US 863505 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9855980 | Date: | 10.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986802 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986802 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G09B17/00, G09B5/06, G09B19/04 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
G09B19/04 (EP,US);
G09B17/00 (KR);
G09B17/003 (EP,US);
G09B5/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/12] | Title | German: | TUTOR ZUM LERNEN DES LESENS UND AUSSPRACHE | [2000/12] | English: | READING AND PRONUNCIATION TUTOR | [2000/12] | French: | MODULE PROFESSEUR DE LECTURE ET DE PRONONCIATION | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 05.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.2003 | BE | 09.04.2003 | CH | 09.04.2003 | FI | 09.04.2003 | FR | 09.04.2003 | IT | 09.04.2003 | LI | 09.04.2003 | NL | 09.04.2003 | CY | 01.06.2003 | LU | 01.06.2003 | IE | 02.06.2003 | MC | 30.06.2003 | DK | 09.07.2003 | GB | 09.07.2003 | GR | 09.07.2003 | PT | 09.07.2003 | SE | 09.07.2003 | DE | 10.07.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
BE | 09.04.2003 | ||
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
FR | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
CY | 01.06.2003 | ||
LU | 01.06.2003 | ||
IE | 02.06.2003 | ||
MC | 30.06.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
GB | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
DE | 10.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
BE | 09.04.2003 | ||
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
FR | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
CY | 01.06.2003 | ||
LU | 01.06.2003 | ||
IE | 02.06.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
GB | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
DE | 10.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
BE | 09.04.2003 | ||
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
FR | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
CY | 01.06.2003 | ||
LU | 01.06.2003 | ||
IE | 02.06.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
DE | 10.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
BE | 09.04.2003 | ||
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
FR | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
CY | 01.06.2003 | ||
IE | 02.06.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
DE | 10.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/35] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
BE | 09.04.2003 | ||
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
FR | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
IE | 02.06.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
DE | 10.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
BE | 09.04.2003 | ||
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
IE | 02.06.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
DE | 10.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
BE | 09.04.2003 | ||
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
DE | 10.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
DE | 10.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 09.04.2003 | |
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 09.04.2003 | |
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 09.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5010495 (WILLETTS JOHN A [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5428707 (GOULD JOEL M [US], et al) [A] 1,2,10,13-16,19-21,25-28,30,32-36,38,39 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9616388 (SOFTRADE INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5540589 (WATERS RICHARD C [US]) [A] 1,2,10,13,18,21,22,25,33,37 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0763816 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5634086 (RTISCHEV DIMITRY [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,8,10,13,21,25,33 * the whole document * |