EP0984980 - 20-ARALKYL-5ALPHA-PREGNANE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/11] | 20-ARALKYL-5$g(a)-PREGNANE DERIVATIVES | ||
[2000/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2000/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEEMHUIS, Johannes, Antonius, Joseph Mekelenkamplaan 33 NL-5345 GL Oss / NL | 02 /
VAN DER LOUW, Jaap Pauwoog 12 NL-5345 EN Oss / NL | 03 /
GROEN, Marinus, Bernard Krijtweg 51 NL-5345 TT Oss / NL | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Kraak, Hajo, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd. Patent Docket Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Kraak, Hajo, et al N.V. Organon, Postbus 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 98924316.7 | 11.05.1998 | [2000/11] | WO1998EP02989 | Priority number, date | EP19970201474 | 16.05.1997 Original published format: EP 97201474 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9852965 | Date: | 26.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0984980 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0984980 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07J9/00, A61K31/575, C07J51/00, C07J31/00, C07J41/00 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
C07J51/00 (EP,US);
C07J9/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07J31/006 (EP,US);
C07J41/0094 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | 20-ARALKYL-5,ALPHA,-PREGNAN DERIVATE | [2000/11] | English: | 20-ARALKYL-5ALPHA-PREGNANE DERIVATIVES | [2000/30] | French: | DERIVES DE 20-ARALKYL-5ALPHA-PREGNANE | [2000/30] |
Former [2000/11] | 20-ARALKYL-5$g(a)-PREGNANE DERIVATIVES | ||
Former [2000/11] | DERIVES DE 20-ARALKYL-5$g(a)-PREGNANE | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.12.2002 | FI | 04.12.2002 | GR | 04.12.2002 | PT | 05.03.2003 | CY | 11.05.2003 | LU | 11.05.2003 | MC | 31.05.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
CY | 11.05.2003 | ||
LU | 11.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
CY | 11.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 04.12.2002 | |
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 05.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9600235 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9627658 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 11 *; | [DA]WO9700884 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DA] - A. BYSKOV ET AL, "Chemical Structure of Sterols That Activate Oocyte Meiosis", NATURE., LONDON GB, (19950406), vol. 374, no. 6522, pages 559 - 562, XP002043016 [DA] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/374559a0 | [DA] - TOSHI HI RO ITOH ET AL, "Methylsterol Compositions of 19 Vegetable Oils", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY., CHAMPAIGN US, (197308), vol. 50, pages 300 - 303, XP002043017 [DA] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02641360 |