EP0943176 - DOUBLE BALANCED COMPACT MIXER USING MICROWAVE MONOLITHIC INTEGRATED CIRCUIT COLD FET QUAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILLEMAZET, Jean-François 76, rue Pasteur F-78700 Conflans Sainte Honorine / FR | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98924369.6 | 04.05.1998 | [1999/38] | WO1998FR00891 | Priority number, date | FR19970005509 | 05.05.1997 Original published format: FR 9705509 | [1999/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9851004 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0943176 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H03D9/06 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
H03D9/0675 (EP);
H03D2200/0023 (EP);
H03D2200/0043 (EP);
H03D2200/0074 (EP);
H03D7/125 (EP);
H03D7/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/38] | Title | German: | KOMPAKTER GEGENTAKTMISCHER, WELCHER EINE MIKROWELLENINTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG MIT VIER KALTEN FETS VERWENDET | [1999/38] | English: | DOUBLE BALANCED COMPACT MIXER USING MICROWAVE MONOLITHIC INTEGRATED CIRCUIT COLD FET QUAD | [1999/38] | French: | MELANGEUR COMPACT DOUBLEMENT EQUILIBRE A QUAD DE TECS FROIDS EN TECHNOLOGIE MMIC | [1999/38] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 30.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/05] | 15.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2219704 (ADAMS RUSSELL ELECTRONICS) [A] 2 * page 19, line 22 - line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5280648 (DOBROVOLNY PIERRE) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9708821 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC) [A] 1 * page 17, line 14 - page 18, line 14; figures 4,6-8 * | [X] - NEUF D ET AL, "DOUBLE BALANCED, COPLANAR, IMAGE REJECTION MIXER USES MONOLITHIC MESFET QUAD", MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, BOSTON, JUNE 10 - 14, 1991, HEITER G L, (19910610), vol. 2, pages 843 - 846, XP000260504 [X] 1-6 * page 843, column 1, line 10 - page 844, column 2, line 29; figures 3,4A,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSYM.1991.147138 | [A] - TETSUO HIROTA ET AL, "K-BAND FREQUENCY UP-CONVERTERS USING REDUCED-SIZE COUPLERS AND DIVIDERS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE GALLIUM ARSENIDE INTEGRATED CIRCUIT SYMPOSIUM (GAAS IC), MONTEREY, OCT. 20 - 23, 1991, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19911020), no. SYMP. 13, pages 53 - 56, XP000313124 [A] 1 * page 53, column 1, line 1 - page 55, column 2, line 12; figures 4,8 * |