EP0984985 - PEPTIDE ANALOGUES, AND THEIR USES IN PARTICULAR IN PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND FOR DIAGNOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3 rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUILLET, Jean-Gérard 39, rue Rapha[l F-92170 Vanves / FR | 02 /
GUICHARD, Gilles 6, quai Matthis F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 03 /
OSTANKOVITCH, Marina 89, rue Broca F-75013 Paris / FR | 04 /
CONNAN, Francine 21, rue du Progrès F-95170 Deuil-La-Barre / FR | 05 /
QUESNEL, Anne 13A, boulevard de Lyon F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 06 /
CHOPPIN, Jeannine 8, rue Saint Fiacre F-51100 Reims / FR | 07 /
BRIAND, Jean-Paul 22, rue des Balayeurs F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 08 /
MULLER, Sylviane 15, avenue de la Forêt Noire F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine Grosset-Fournier & Demachy 54, rue Saint-Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine Grosset-Fournier & Demachy s.a.r.l. 20, rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98924401.7 | 07.05.1998 | [2000/11] | WO1998FR00923 | Priority number, date | FR19970005677 | 07.05.1997 Original published format: FR 9705677 | [2000/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9850423 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0984985 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
A61K39/0005 (EP);
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K39/145 (EP);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4644 (EP,US);
C07K14/4748 (EP);
G01N33/56977 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16022 (EP);
C12N2760/16034 (EP);
G01N2500/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | PEPTIDANALOGE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG BESONDERS IN PHARMAZEUTISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND FÜR DIE DIAGNOSE | [2000/11] | English: | PEPTIDE ANALOGUES, AND THEIR USES IN PARTICULAR IN PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND FOR DIAGNOSIS | [2000/11] | French: | ANALOGUES PEPTIDIQUES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS NOTAMMENT DANS DES COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ET POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC | [2000/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 20.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/22] | 07.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9202543 (CYTEL CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO9304080 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]); | [X]WO9405311 (DEAKIN RES LTD [AU], et al); | [X]WO9523166 (DEAKIN RES LTD [AU], et al); | [DX]WO9524916 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al); | [X]WO9529193 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US]); | [X]WO9639443 (IGEN INC [US]); | [PX]WO9734613 (UNIV VIRGINIA [US]); | [PA]WO9802538 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al); |