EP1044361 - THE OPTICAL DETECTION AND ANALYSIS OF SUB-MICRON PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARR, Robert Jeffrey Geddes Wayside, Thorneydown Road Winterbourne Gunner Wiltshire SP4 6LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states CARR, Robert Jeffrey Geddes Wayside, Thorneydown Road Winterbourne Gunner, Wiltshire SP4 6LN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 20 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Marks & Clerk 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham, GL50 1RQ / GB | ||
Former [2002/02] | Higgins, Michael Roger, et al A.R. Davies & Co. 27, Imperial Square Cheltenham Glos. GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98924492.6 | 01.06.1998 | [2000/42] | WO1998GB01591 | Priority number, date | GB19970012202 | 13.06.1997 Original published format: GB 9712202 | [2000/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9857148 | Date: | 17.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1044361 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/55, G01N15/02 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
G01N21/553 (EP,US);
G01N15/1433 (EP,US);
G01N21/648 (EP,US);
G01N15/14 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1486 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1497 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/42] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER NACHWEIS UND ANALYSE VON SUBMIKROMETERTEILCHEN | [2000/42] | English: | THE OPTICAL DETECTION AND ANALYSIS OF SUB-MICRON PARTICLES | [2000/42] | French: | DETECTION OPTIQUE ET ANALYSE DE PARTICULES INFERIEURES AU MICRON | [2000/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 05.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 06.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/42] | 14.05.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.05.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.04.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.1999 | 21.04.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.1999 | 21.04.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.1999 | 21.04.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.1999 | 21.04.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.1999 | 21.04.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.1999 | 21.04.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.09.2000 | 30.06.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2001 | 30.06.2007 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3695765 (BOL JAN PAUL, et al) [A] 1,14 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 60; figure 1 *; | [A]US3975084 (BLOCK MYRON J) [A] 1,14 * column 4, lines 7-62 ** column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 8; figure 13 *; | [A]US5362653 (CARR ROBERT J G [GB], et al) [A] 1,14 * column 8, lines 29-63; figure 3 * |