EP0990650 - TRICYCLIC PYRROLE OR PYRAZOLE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states YAMANOUCHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. No. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAENO, Kyoichi, Yamanouchi Pharm. Co., Ltd. 21, Miyukigaoka, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | 02 /
KAZUTA, Ken-ichi, Yamanouchi Pharm. Co., Ltd. 21, Miyukigaoka, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | 03 /
KUBOTA, Hideki, Yamanouchi Pharm. Co., Ltd. 21, Miyukigaoka, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | 04 /
SHIMADA, Itsuro, Yamanouchi Pharm. Co., Ltd. 21, Miyukigaoka, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | 05 /
KIMIZUKA, Tetsuya, Yamanouchi Pharm. Co., Ltd. 21, Miyukigaoka, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | 06 /
SAKAMOTO, Shuichi, Yamanouchi Pharm. Co., Ltd. 21,Miyukigaoka, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 -0841 / JP | 07 /
WANIBUCHI, Fumikazu, Yamanouchi Pharm. Co., Ltd. 21, Miyukigaoka, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Geering, Keith Edwin Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Geering, Keith Edwin REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98924579.0 | 11.06.1998 | [2000/14] | WO1998JP02579 | Priority number, date | JP19970157255 | 13.06.1997 Original published format: JP 15725597 | [2000/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9856768 | Date: | 17.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0990650 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0990650 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0990650 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/54, C07D471/04, C07D491/048, C07D495/04, C07D498/04, C07D513/04, A61K31/40, A61K31/415, A61K31/42, A61K31/425, A61K31/47, A61K31/55 | [2000/14] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/14] | Title | German: | TRIZYKLISCHE PYROL- ODER PYRAZOLDERIVATE | [2000/14] | English: | TRICYCLIC PYRROLE OR PYRAZOLE DERIVATIVES | [2000/14] | French: | DERIVES TRICYCLIQUES DE PYRROLE OU DE PYRAZOLE | [2000/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1999 | Translation filed | 05.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 26.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.08.2005 | BE | 17.08.2005 | CH | 17.08.2005 | FI | 17.08.2005 | LI | 17.08.2005 | DK | 17.11.2005 | GR | 17.11.2005 | SE | 17.11.2005 | PT | 17.01.2006 | [2006/26] |
Former [2006/25] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0657426 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [YD] 1,6-8 * example -; claims 1-12,17-21 *; | [X]WO9517405 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1 * Intermediate 22 *; | [YD]EP0700905 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [YD] 1,6-8 * the whole document *; | [Y] - MOREAU J L ET AL, "5HT2C RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST-LIKE PROPERTIES IN THE ANHEDONIA MODEL OF DEPRESSION IN RATS", EUROPEAN NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1996), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 0924-977X, pages 169 - 175, XP000654840 [Y] 1,6-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0924-977X(96)00015-6 | [Y] - ZEMSKII, B. P. ET AL, "Synthesis and neurotropic activity of heterocyclic derivatives of 1-piperazinoalkylindoles", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19790813), Database accession no. 91:56952, URL: STN, XP002185506 [Y] 1,6-8 * abstract * | [ ] - KHIM.-FARM. ZH., (1979), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 40 - 44 | [XP] - BOES M ET AL, "Novel Agonists of 5HT2C Receptors. Synthesis and Biological Evaluation of Substituted 2-(Indol-1-yl)-1-methylethylamines and 2-(Indeno[1,2-b]pyrrol-1-yl)-1-methylethylamines", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (19970815), vol. 40, no. 17, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2762 - 2769, XP002124091 [XP] 1,6-8 * compounds 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm970030l | International search | [A]JPS50106958 ; | [A]JPH07149723 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | [A]WO9532967 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) |