EP0983450 - BEARING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediRox AB Kuskvägen 8 191 62 Sollentuna / SE | [2004/22] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states Global Hemostasis Institute MGR AB P.O. Box 125 581 02 Linköping / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOHLIN, Leif PL 19 Öved S-275 94 Sjöbo / SE | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Onn, Thorsten, et al Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Onn, Thorsten, et al AB STOCKHOLMS PATENTBYRA Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 98924721.8 | 26.05.1998 | [2000/10] | WO1998SE00985 | Priority number, date | SE19970001959 | 26.05.1997 Original published format: SE 9701959 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9854475 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0983450 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0983450 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16C32/04, G01N11/14 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
G01N11/14 (EP,US);
F16C32/0417 (EP,US);
F16C32/0425 (EP,US);
F16C32/0429 (EP,US);
F16C32/0444 (EP,US);
F16C39/063 (EP,US);
F16C2370/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] | Title | German: | LAGERVORRICHTUNG | [2000/10] | English: | BEARING DEVICE | [2000/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTEUR | [2000/10] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2004 | BE | 18.08.2004 | CH | 18.08.2004 | FI | 18.08.2004 | LI | 18.08.2004 | NL | 18.08.2004 | DK | 18.11.2004 | GR | 18.11.2004 | ES | 29.11.2004 | PT | 18.01.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP58099727 ; | [A]SU1455282 ; | [A]US4328701 (MAU-TUNG DO, et al); | [A]DE3837845 (VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO9429692 (RADIAN CORP [US]); | [A]US5506459 (RITTS GARY [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 7, No. 202, (P-221); & JP,A,58 099 727 (IWAMOTO SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 14 June 1983., & JP58099727 A 19830614 | [A] - DERWENT'S ABSTRACT, No. 89-322952/44, Week 8944; & SU,A,1 455 282 (TOMSK UNIV. APPL. MAT.) 30 January 1989., & SU1455282 A 00000000 |