Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9853791 | Global Dossier | 15.04.1999 | A3 | WO9853791 | 03.12.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US4790697 | 29.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0061075 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28811399 | 08.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002541167 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006040 | 08.03.2000 | US28811399 | 08.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002515907 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US4790697 | 29.05.1997 | US9810942 | 29.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1165015 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006040 | 08.03.2000 | US28811399 | 08.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0986362 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US4790697 | 29.05.1997 | US9810942 | 29.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2290986 | 03.12.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8545398 | 27.05.1998 | US4790697 | 29.05.1997 | US9810942 | 29.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2369903 | 17.05.2011 | C | CA2369903 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006040 | 08.03.2000 | US28811399 | 08.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE20023328U | 30.10.2003 | U1 | Priority number | Date | EP00913808 | 08.03.2000 | US28811399 | 08.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA01010162 | 30.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006040 | 08.03.2000 | US28811399 | 08.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6561807 | 13.05.2003 | B2 | US2002193502 | 19.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8545398 | 27.05.1998 | US81482102 | 01.03.2002 | US28811399 | 08.04.1999 |