EP0986362 - IMPROVED POLYVINYLSILOXANE IMPRESSION MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENTSPLY International Inc. 570 West College Avenue P.O. Box 872 York, PA 17405-0872 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states DENTSPLY INTERNATIONAL, INC. 570 West College Avenue, P.O. Box 872 York, PA 17405-0872 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIEDLER, Jurgen, Hans Neugasse 38-40 D-78462 Konstanz / DE | 02 /
HARE, Robert, V. R.D. 3, Box 160-6 Georgetown, DE 19947 / US | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Hartz, Nikolai F., Dr., et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Patentanwälte, Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98924981.8 | 29.05.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998US10942 | Priority number, date | USP 47906 | 29.05.1997 | USA | 27.05.1998 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9853791 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0986362 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/10 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
A61K6/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/12] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES POLYVINYLSILOXAN-ABDRUCKMATERIAL | [2000/12] | English: | IMPROVED POLYVINYLSILOXANE IMPRESSION MATERIAL | [2000/12] | French: | MATERIAU A EMPREINTE AMELIORE AU POLYVINYLSILOXANE | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 02.02.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO9826748 (DENTSPLY INT INC [US]) [E] 1-18 * page 9, paragraph 1 - page 12, paragraph 1 * * example -; claim - *; | [PX]WO9740102 (KETTENBACH FABRIK CHEM ERZEUGN [DE], et al) [PX] 1,4,7-9 * page 7, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 15, paragraph 2 * * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9632088 (DENTSPLY INT INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7-18 * page 4, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 19, paragraph 2 * * example -; claim - *; | [AD]WO9317654 (PARADISO VINCENT [US]); | [AD]EP0522341 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [AD]US4657959 (BRYAN THOMAS T [US], et al) |