EP1047442 - BONE MORPHOGENETIC PROTEINS AND THEIR USE IN BONE GROWTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nimni, Marcel E. 2800 Nelson Way No. 908 Santa Monica, CA 90405-4037 / US | For all designated states Hall, Frederick L. Suite 1803 West, 345 Pioneer Drive Glendale, CA 91203 / US | For all designated states Wu, Lingtao 1114 Valencia Way Arcadia, CA 91006 / US | For all designated states Han, Bo 1351 Elm Avnue San Gabriel, CA 91775 / US | For all designated states Shors, Edwin C. 2121 President Street Costa Mesa, CA 92627 / US | [2000/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Ian Edward Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Stevens, Ian Edward Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2000/44] | Bassett, Richard Simon Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98925128.5 | 02.06.1998 | [2000/44] | WO1998US11189 | Priority number, date | US19970868452 | 03.06.1997 Original published format: US 868452 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9855137 | Date: | 10.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047442 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, C07H21/04, C12N1/21, C12P21/00, G01N33/53, C07K14/51 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
A61L27/24 (EP,US);
A61L27/38 (EP,US);
A61L27/60 (EP,US);
C07K14/495 (EP,US);
C07K14/51 (EP,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61L2430/02 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US);
C07K2319/21 (EP,US);
C07K2319/50 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/44] | A61K38/18, C07H21/04, C12N1/21, C12P21/00, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/44] | Title | German: | KNOCHENMORPHOGENESEPROTEINEN UND IHRE ANWENDUNG ZUR FÖRDERUNG DES KNOCHENWACHSTUMS | [2000/44] | English: | BONE MORPHOGENETIC PROTEINS AND THEIR USE IN BONE GROWTH | [2000/44] | French: | PROTEINES MORPHOGENETIQUES OSSEUSES ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LA CROISSANCE OSSEUSE | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 13.01.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.02.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2000 | 15.02.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2000 | 15.02.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2000 | 15.02.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2000 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.02.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 30.06.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.12.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9516044 (GENETICS INST [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,10,11,13,19-24 * example 4; claim 9 *; | [XY]EP0704532 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,10-14,19-24 * example 7; claims 2,3,5,23,24 * [Y] 30-33,35,38-41,43,44,46; | [Y]WO9300050 (GENETICS INST [US]) [Y] 30-33,38-41,43,46 * claims 3,6 *; | [Y]US5443531 (RIPAMONTI UGO [ZA]) [Y] 30,32,35,38,40,44 * column 1, line 36; claim 2 *; | [A]WO8910409 (GENETICS INST [US]); | [A]WO9306872 (GENETICS INST [US]); | [A]WO9011366 (GENETICS INST [US]); | [A]WO9209697 (CELTRIX LAB INC [US]) | [A] - NIMNI M E, "Polypeptide growth factors: targeted delivery systems", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (1997), vol. 18, no. 18, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 1201 - 1225, XP004086390 [A] 1-24,30-36,38-46 * page 1212 - page 1213; figures 9,10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(97)00050-1 | International search | [Y]WO9639430 (HALL FREDERICK L [US], et al); | [Y] - WOZNEY J. M., ET AL., "NOVEL REGULATORS OF BONE FORMATION: MOLECULAR CLONES AND ACTIVITIES", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, US, US, (19881216), vol. 242., doi:10.1126/science.3201241, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1528 - 1534., XP002914367 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.3201241 | [Y] - SODEK J., ET AL., "REGULATION OF OSTEOPONTIN EXPRESSION IN OSTEOBLASTS.", Annals of the New York Academy of Sciences, New York Academy of Sciences., US, US, (19950421), vol. 760., doi:10.1111/j.1749-6632.1995.tb44633.x, ISSN 0077-8923, pages 223 - 241., XP002914368 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1995.tb44633.x |