blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0986823

EP0986823 - BANDPASS REACTIVE COLLISON CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2010
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 24.10.2012  [2012/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MDS Inc.
100 International Boulevard Etobicoke
Ontario M9W 6J6 / CA
[2010/02]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
MDS Inc.
100 International Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6J6 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / TANNER, Scott, D.
184 Kemano Road
Aurora, Ontario L4G 4Z2 / CA
02 / BARANOV, Vladimir, I.
60 Cartier Crescent
Richmond Hill, Ontario L4C 2N4 / CA
[2000/12]
Representative(s)Hackney, Nigel John, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]Hackney, Nigel John, et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98925348.902.06.1998
[2000/12]
WO1998CA00536
Priority number, dateUS19970048583P04.06.1997         Original published format: US 48583 P
US19980074831P17.02.1998         Original published format: US 74831 P
[2000/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9856030
Date:10.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0986823
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0986823
Date:13.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:H01J49/42
[2000/12]
CPC:
H01J49/422 (EP,US); H01J49/005 (EP,US); H01J49/0077 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/12]
TitleGerman:REAKTIVE KOLLISIONSZELLE MIT BANDPASS[2000/12]
English:BANDPASS REACTIVE COLLISON CELL[2000/12]
French:CHAMBRE DE COLLISION REAGISSANT A LA BANDE PASSANTE[2000/12]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2000National basic fee paid 
04.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/12]
07.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
11.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2009Date of oral proceedings
18.06.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.06.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2009Fee for grant paid
30.10.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09005708.4  / EP2099059
Opposition(s)14.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
12.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.01.2010
BE13.01.2010
CY13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
IE02.06.2010
LU02.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
[2012/43]
Former [2011/25]AT13.01.2010
BE13.01.2010
CY13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
IE02.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2010/44]AT13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2010/30]AT13.01.2010
Cited inInternational search[DA]US3065640  (LANGMUIR DAVID B, et al) [DA] 1* claim 1 *;
 [X]US4234791  (ENKE CHRISTIE G, et al) [X] 1,16 * column 1 - column 2; claim 1 *;
 [XAY]US4535235  (MCIVER JR ROBERT T [US]) [X] 1-7,10,11,15 * column 5, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * [A] 14,49,58,59 [Y] 8-10,12,13,24,25,33,36,51-57;
 [A]US4540884  (STAFFORD GEORGE C [US], et al) [A] 1,17-20,26-32,40,45 * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 16 *;
 [Y]WO9309562  (TELEDYNE MEC [US]) [Y] 8,9,13,33 * abstract *;
 [X]US5248875  (DOUGLAS DONALD [CA], et al) [X] 1,16 * column 1 *;
 [Y]GB2299446  (BRUKER FRANZEN ANALYTIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12,36 * abstract *;
 [Y]GB2301704  (BRUKER FRANZEN ANALYTIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 10,24,25,51-57 * page 6, paragraph L *;
 [PA]EP0813228  (MICROMASS LTD [GB]) [PA] 1,10,24,25,47,48 * abstract *
ExaminationUS5134286
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.