blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0968629

EP0968629 - FLAT ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR POST-ASSEMBLING ADDITIONAL COMPONENTS ON A PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.12.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.01.2003  [2003/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LUDWIG, Gunter
Am Vogelherd 14 A
D-90592 Schwarzenbruck / DE
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date98925391.913.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998DE00760
Priority number, dateDE199711047713.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19710477
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9841069
Date:17.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968629
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968629
Date:30.01.2002
Language:DE
[2002/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationIPC:H05K3/00
[2000/01]
CPC:
H05K3/3447 (EP); H05K1/116 (EP); H05K2201/0949 (EP);
H05K2201/10651 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB [2000/01]
TitleGerman:FLACHBAUGRUPPE UND VERFAHREN ZUM NACHTRÄGLICHEN AUFBRINGEN VON ZUSATZBAUELEMENTEN AUF EINE LEITERPLATTE[2000/01]
English:FLAT ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR POST-ASSEMBLING ADDITIONAL COMPONENTS ON A PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD[2000/01]
French:MODULE PLAT ET PROCEDE DE MONTAGE ULTERIEUR DE COMPOSANTS SUPPLEMENTAIRES SUR UNE CARTE IMPRIMEE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase03.09.1999National basic fee paid 
03.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
29.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2001Fee for grant paid
05.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.10.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS6132450  ;
 [A]JPS5911658  ;
 [DA]DE3521752  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,5,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4696105  (BREYA EDWARD F [US]) [A] 1,5* column W *;
 [A]DE3817267  (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,5,7 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860627), vol. 10, no. 184, Database accession no. (E - 415), & JP61032450 A 19860215 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,3,5,7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840426), vol. 8, no. 91, Database accession no. (E - 241), & JP59011658 A 19840121 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.