EP0968519 - IONIZATION CHAMBER FOR RADIOMETRIC MEASURING INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vacutec Messtechnik GmbH Dornblüthstrasse 14 01277 Dresden / DE | [2000/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUBE, Siegfried Neubühlauer Strasse 21 a D-01324 Dresden / DE | 02 /
URBAN, Franz-Josef An der Schwarzen Hecke 70 a D-55270 Ober-Olm / DE | 03 /
HILDEBRANDT, Steffen Clausen-Dahl-Strasse 10 D-01219 Dresden / DE | [2002/37] |
Former [2000/01] | 01 /
LAUBE, Siegfried Schneebergstrasse 10 D-01277 Dresden / DE | ||
02 /
URBAN, Franz-Josef Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 9 D-01809 Heidenau / DE | |||
03 /
HILDEBRANDT, Steffen Clausen-Dahl-Strasse 10 D-01219 Dresden / DE | Representative(s) | Pfeiffer, Eva Brucknerstrasse 9 B 01309 Dresden / DE | [2003/04] |
Former [2000/01] | Pfeiffer, Eva Brucknerstrasse 9 B 01309 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 98925415.6 | 20.03.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998DE00818 | Priority number, date | DE1997112032 | 21.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19712032 | DE1997131608 | 23.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19731608 | [2000/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9843116 | Date: | 01.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0968519 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968519 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01J47/02 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
H01J47/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | IONISATIONSKAMMER FÜR RADIOMETRISCHE MESSEINRICHTUNGEN | [2000/01] | English: | IONIZATION CHAMBER FOR RADIOMETRIC MEASURING INSTRUMENTS | [2000/01] | French: | CHAMBRE D'IONISATION POUR INSTRUMENTS DE MESURE RADIOMETRIQUES | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 12.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Request for further processing for: | 25.11.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 26.11.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.12.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.05.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 21.05.2003 | GB | 21.05.2003 | SE | 21.08.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 21.05.2003 | |
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 21.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS6273548 ; | [A]DE1040707 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]FR2105649 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE) [A] 1 * page 4, line 5 - line 14; figure . *; | [PY]DE19545340 (VACUTEC MESTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [PY] 1-3,24 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870903), vol. 011, no. 271, Database accession no. (E - 536), & JP62073548 A 19870404 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [Y] 1-3,24 * abstract * |