EP0983400 - TRACK SUPERSTRUCTURE, IN PARTICULAR FOR TRAMWAY, TRAM-RAILWAY AND UNDERGROUND RAILWAY LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mecno-Rail S.r.l. Via Giordano Bruno, 29 30174 Venezia Mestre / IT | [2000/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAVARON, Claudio Via Giordano Bruno, 29 I-30174 Venezia Mestre / IT | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Piovesana, Paolo c/o Praxi Intellectual Property S.p.A.- Venezia Via Francesco Baracca, 5/A 30173 Venezia-Mestre / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Piovesana, Paolo Corso del Popolo, 70 30172 Venezia-Mestre / IT | Application number, filing date | 98925578.1 | 12.05.1998 | [2000/10] | WO1998EP02764 | Priority number, date | IT1997VE00018 | 13.05.1997 Original published format: IT VE970018 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9851863 | Date: | 19.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0983400 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0983400 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E01B21/00, E01B2/00 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
E01B2/00 (EP);
E01B1/002 (EP);
E01B21/00 (EP);
E01B1/005 (EP);
E01B2204/01 (EP);
E01B2204/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] | Extension states | RO | 07.12.1999 | SI | 07.12.1999 | Title | German: | GLEISOBERBAU, INSBESONDERE FÜR STRASSENBAHNEN, STRASSEN-EISENBAHNEN UND UNTERGRUNDBAHNLINIEN | [2000/10] | English: | TRACK SUPERSTRUCTURE, IN PARTICULAR FOR TRAMWAY, TRAM-RAILWAY AND UNDERGROUND RAILWAY LINES | [2000/10] | French: | SUPERSTRUCTURE DE VOIES, EN PARTICULIER, POUR DES VOIES FERREES DE TRAMWAYS, DE CHEMINS DE FER ET DE METROS | [2000/10] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.11.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 23.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.09.2002 | BE | 25.09.2002 | CH | 25.09.2002 | FR | 25.09.2002 | IT | 25.09.2002 | LI | 25.09.2002 | NL | 25.09.2002 | SE | 25.12.2002 | PT | 26.12.2002 | DE | 28.12.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | GB | 12.05.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
BE | 25.09.2002 | ||
CH | 25.09.2002 | ||
FR | 25.09.2002 | ||
LI | 25.09.2002 | ||
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
DE | 28.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
GB | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
BE | 25.09.2002 | ||
CH | 25.09.2002 | ||
LI | 25.09.2002 | ||
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
DE | 28.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
GB | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
BE | 25.09.2002 | ||
CH | 25.09.2002 | ||
LI | 25.09.2002 | ||
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
DE | 28.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
BE | 25.09.2002 | ||
CH | 25.09.2002 | ||
LI | 25.09.2002 | ||
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
DE | 28.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
CH | 25.09.2002 | ||
LI | 25.09.2002 | ||
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
DE | 28.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
CH | 25.09.2002 | ||
LI | 25.09.2002 | ||
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 25.09.2002 | |
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | SE | 25.12.2002 | |
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 25.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2707615 (EISSES JACOBUS ALBERTUS [NL], et al); | [A]DE3539225 (MAX KNAPE GMBH & CO FA [DE]) [A] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 55 - column 4; figure . *; | [A]DE3824132 (KUNZ ALFRED & CO [DE]); | [A]FR2657096 (SUD OUEST TRAVAUX [FR]); | [A]FR2691484 (VANOTTI GERARD [FR]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9517552 (BUTZBACHER WEICHENBAU GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]EP0697485 (MONTCOCOL TP [FR]) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 18 - column 4; figure - * |