blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0986690

EP0986690 - VALVE FOR USE IN A WELLBORE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weatherford/Lamb, Inc.
515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston
Texas 77027 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/44]For all designated states
WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC.
515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600
Houston Texas 77027 / US
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
Weatherford/Lamb Inc.
CSC - The United States Corporation Company, 1013 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BUDDE, Peter
Waterleidingstraat 1
NL-3134 KC Vlaardingen / NL
[2000/12]
Representative(s)Lind, Robert, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
2nd Floor, Wytham Court
11 West Way
Oxford OX2 0JB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Lind, Robert, et al
Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford
OX4 2RU / GB
Former [2000/12]Lind, Robert, et al
Marks & Clerk, Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date98925795.104.06.1998
[2000/12]
WO1998GB01487
Priority number, dateUS1997086851104.06.1997         Original published format: US 868511
[2000/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9855729
Date:10.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0986690
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0986690
Date:26.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:E21B21/10, F16K1/38, F16K25/00
[2000/12]
CPC:
E21B21/10 (EP,US); E21B21/106 (EP,US); E21B33/167 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/12]
TitleGerman:VENTIL ZUR ANWENDUNG IM BOHRLOCH[2000/12]
English:VALVE FOR USE IN A WELLBORE[2000/12]
French:CLAPET DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE DANS UN PUITS DE FORAGE[2000/12]
Entry into regional phase19.11.1999National basic fee paid 
19.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/12]
18.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2002Fee for grant paid
22.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT26.02.2003
[2008/16]
Cited inInternational search[X]US3945390  (HUBER RICHARD);
 [A]US4050473  (CHO NAKWON);
 [A]US4257442  (CLAYCOMB JACK R);
 [A]US4624316  (BALDRIDGE MORRIS G [US], et al);
 [A]US4625762  (HASSANZADEH HEDAYAT H [US], et al);
 [A]US4834183  (VINZANT MICHAEL B [US], et al);
 [X]US5048555  (MIETH HANS O [DE], et al);
 [AD]WO9525873  (WEATHERFORD LAMB [US], et al);
 [A]GB2305678  (BAKER HUGHES INC [US])
by applicantWO9525873
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.