EP0986748 - ELECTRODES FOR THE MEASUREMENT OF ANALYTES IN SMALL SAMPLE VOLUMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambridge Sensors Ltd. Units 9 and 10 Cardinal Park Godmanchester, Cambs PE29 2XG / GB | [2003/24] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states Cambridge Sensors Ltd. Downhams House, Downhams Lane Cambridge CB4 1XT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Stephen, Charles P.O. Box 2266 El Granada, CA 94018 / US | 02 /
YON-HIN, Bernadette Cambridge Sensors Limited Dowhams House Dowhams Lane Cambridge CB4 1XT / GB | 03 /
BLAIR, Neil 122 Limes Road Hardwick Cambridge CB3 7XU / GB | [2000/20] |
Former [2000/12] | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Stephen, Charles 500 Stone Pine Road P.O. Box 3559 Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | ||
02 /
YON-HIN, Bernadette Cambridge Sensors Limited Dowhams House Dowhams Lane Cambridge CB4 1XT / GB | |||
03 /
BLAIR, Neil 122 Limes Road Hardwick Cambridge CB3 7XU / GB | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98925825.6 | 03.06.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998GB01624 | Priority number, date | GB19970011395 | 04.06.1997 Original published format: GB 9711395 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9855856 | Date: | 10.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986748 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986748 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/403, G01N27/30 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
G01N27/3272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/39] |
Former [2000/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | ||
Former [2000/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ELEKTRODEN ZUR MESSUNG VON ANALYTEN IN KLEINEN PROBEMENGEN | [2000/12] | English: | ELECTRODES FOR THE MEASUREMENT OF ANALYTES IN SMALL SAMPLE VOLUMES | [2000/12] | French: | ELECTRODES SERVANT A MESURER DES SUBSTANCES A ANALYSER DANS DES SPECIMENS PRESENTANT UN VOLUME LIMITE | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 06.01.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, FI, GR, IE, LU, PT | 18.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.02.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0095946 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,8 * page 15, line 19 - line 21 *; | [Y]EP0215446 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,8 * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0271102 (HORIBA LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 15 *; | [A]WO9214836 (ASULAB SA [CH]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 19; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0593096 (MEDISENSE INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 37 - line 56; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5429735 (JOHNSON LARRY D [US], et al) [A] 6,7* column 2, line 21 - line 23 * | Examination | US5628890 |