Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0979300 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB9801658 | 05.06.1998 | GB9711680 | 05.06.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9855642 | Global Dossier | 04.03.1999 | A3 | WO9855642 | 10.12.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB9711680 | 05.06.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9711680D0 | 06.08.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9711680 | 05.06.1997 |