EP0979300 - ENZYMATIC SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BAXENDEN CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED Paragon Works Baxenden, Near Accrington Lancashire BB5 2SL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states THE BAXENDEN CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED Paragon Works Baxenden, Near Accrington Lancashire BB5 2SL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAYLOR, Alan Baxenden Chemicals Limited Paragon Works Baxenden Near Accrington Lancashire BB5 2SL / GB | 02 /
BINNS, Falmai Baxenden Chemicals Limited Paragon Works Baxenden Near Accrington Lancashire BB5 2SL / GB | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98925849.6 | 05.06.1998 | [2000/07] | WO1998GB01658 | Priority number, date | GB19970011680 | 05.06.1997 Original published format: GB 9711680 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9855642 | Date: | 10.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0979300 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/44, C12P7/62, C08L67/02, C08L67/04, C08G63/02, C08G63/60, C08G63/82 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
C08G63/60 (EP);
C08G18/42 (EP);
C08G18/4238 (EP);
C08G63/82 (EP);
C12P7/62 (EP);
C12P7/625 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/07] | Title | German: | ENZIMATISCHE SYNTHESE VON POLYESTERN MITTELS LIPASE | [2000/07] | English: | ENZYMATIC SYNTHESIS | [2000/07] | French: | SYNTHESE ENZYMATIQUE | [2000/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 05.05.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO9412652 (BAXENDEN CHEMICALS LTD.) [XD] 1-10,19-24 * the whole document *; | [XD]GB2272904 (BAXENDEN CHEMICALS LTD.) [XD] 1-10,19-24 * the whole document * |