EP0985149 - METHODS FOR EVALUATING TISSUE MORPHOGENESIS AND ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | 27.06.2008 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | 27.06.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curis, Inc. 45 Moulton Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2001/20] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states CREATIVE BIOMOLECULES, INC. 45 South Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMPATH, Kuber, T. 98 Pamela Drive Holliston, MA 01746 / US | 02 /
COHEN, Charles, M. 1 Harrington Lane Weston, MA 02193 / US | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | MacLean, Martin Robert, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | MacLean, Martin Robert, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [2000/11] | Schlich, George William, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98926115.1 | 29.05.1998 | [2000/11] | WO1998US10909 | Priority number, date | US19970866827 | 30.05.1997 Original published format: US 866827 | US19970048062P | 30.05.1997 Original published format: US 48062 P | US19970048063P | 30.05.1997 Original published format: US 48063 P | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9854572 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0985149 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, A61K38/18 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
A61K38/1875 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
G01N33/5088 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER GEWEBEMORPHOGENESE UND MORPHOGENESISCHE TÄTIGKEIT | [2000/11] | English: | METHODS FOR EVALUATING TISSUE MORPHOGENESIS AND ACTIVITY | [2000/11] | French: | PROCEDES POUR EVALUER LA MORPHOGENESE DES TISSUS ET LEUR ACTIVITE | [2000/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 08.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/31] | 03.07.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP08158912.9 / EP1988395 | EP10179679.5 / EP2309261 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0723013 (STRYKER CORP [US]) [X] 76-122 * claims 10,18 * * page 4, line 20 - line 22 * * page 8, line 14 - line 19 * * page 24, line 49 - line 57 *; | [X]EP0714665 (STRYKER CORP [US]) [X] 76-122 * claim 9 * * page 5, line 28 - line 49 * * page 24, line 23 - page 27, line 54 *; | [PX]WO9813509 (CREATIVE BIOMOLECULES INC [US]) [PX] 1-122 * claims 21-30,36-60 * * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 17 * * page 6, line 8 - line 15 * * page 7, line 13 - line 29 *; | [PX]WO9732033 (UNIV VANDERBILT [US]) [PX] 29-75 * claims 6-10,12,13,17,22 * * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 15 * * page 4, line 20 - line 24 * * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 2 * * page 22, line 19 - line 25 * * page 25, line 26 - line 27 * * page 26, line 9 - page 27, line 13 *; | [XY]WO9630038 (UNIV ROCKEFELLER [US]) [X] 29-122 * claim - * * page 8, line 25 - page 10, line 13 * * page 27, line 30 - page 28, line 5 * * page 33, line 4 - page 35, line 24 * [Y] 1-28; | [XY]WO9514104 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [X] 29-122 * claim - * * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 5 * * page 12, line 32 - page 13, line 30 * * page 19, line 7 - line 18 * * page 20, line 29 - page 21, line 17 * * page 25, line 4 - line 16 * [Y] 1-28; | [DX]WO9403600 (CREATIVE BIOMOLECULES INC [US]) [DX] 29-122 * claims 18-24,27-38 * * page 4, line 15 - line 25 * * page 6, line 26 - line 33 * * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 5 * * page 51, line 12 - page 58, line 7 *; | [DX]WO9403200 (CREATIVE BIOMOLECULES INC [US]) [DX] 29-75 * claims 2-77,83-92 * * page 8, line 4 - page 9, line 5 * * page 17, line 28 - page 19, line 16 *; | [Y]WO9305172 (CREATIVE BIOMOLECULES INC [US]) [Y] 1-28 * claim - * * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 7 * * page P6, paragraph 1 * * page 33 *; | [PX]US5641743 (BOHLEN PETER [US], et al) [PX] 29-122 * claim - * * column 1, line 43 - line 67 * * column 3, line 5 - line 33 *; | [X]US5169837 (LAGARDE ALAIN E [CA], et al) [X] 76-122 * claims 7-18 * * column 3, line 12 - line 27 * * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 36 * |