EP1001764 - HETEROCYCLIC AMIDE COMPOUNDS AS CELL ADHESION INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. (a New Jersey corp.) 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, N.J. 07065 / US | [2000/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DURETTE, Philippe, L. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 02 /
HAGMANN, William, K. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 03 /
MacCOSS, Malcolm 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 04 /
MILLS, Sander, G. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 05 /
MUMFORD, Richard, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 06 /
VAN RIPER, Gail, M. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 07 /
SCHMIDT, Jack, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 08 /
KEVIN, Nancy, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2004/27] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [2000/21] | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98926122.7 | 29.05.1998 | [2000/21] | WO1998US10940 | Priority number, date | US19970048017P | 29.05.1997 Original published format: US 48017 P | GB19970014314 | 07.07.1997 Original published format: GB 9714314 | US19970066525P | 25.11.1997 Original published format: US 66525 P | GB19980000686 | 14.01.1998 Original published format: GB 9800686 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9853814 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1001764 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/02, A61K31/405, A61K31/395, A61K31/41, A61K31/415, A61K31/425, A61K31/435, A61K31/445 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/472 (EP);
A61K31/401 (EP);
A61K31/445 (EP);
A61K31/4725 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K5/06139 (EP);
C07K5/06165 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/40] | C07F9/02, A61K31/404, A61P43/00 | ||
Former IPC [2000/21] | A61K31/395, A61K31/40, A61K31/41, A61K31/415, A61K31/425, A61K31/435, A61K31/44, A61K31/445, A61K31/47, A61K31/495, A61K31/535, C07D205/02, C07D209/04, C07D209/14, C07D209/30, C07D217/12, C07D235/02, C07D233/64, C07D241/02, C07D257/04, C07D265/30, C07D275/02, C07D277/02, C07D277/08, C07D295/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | HETEROZYKLISCHE AMIDE ALS ZELLADHÄSIONSHEMMERN | [2000/21] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC AMIDE COMPOUNDS AS CELL ADHESION INHIBITORS | [2000/21] | French: | COMPOSES D'AMIDE HETEROCYCLIQUES UTILISES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE L'ADHESION CELLULAIRE | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 29.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 07.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.09.2008 | 09.07.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/07] | 04.10.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9721690 (CEPHALON INC [US]) [PX] 1-20 * pages 1-3 * * examples 81,84-86,94-96,102,103,111 *; | [X]EP0443132 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-20 * page 3 *; | [A]EP0696593 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [A] 1-14,17-20 * examples 1-3,6,9-11,28 *; | [A]US4350698 (GLEASON JOHN G, et al) [A] 1-14,17-20 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9640641 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14,17-20 * the whole document *; | [X] - CALCAGNI A ET AL, "Peptides containing the sulfonamide junction: Synthesis, structure, and conformation of Z-Tau-Pro-Phe-NHiPr", BIOPOLYMERS 1997 UNITED STATES, (1997), vol. 41, no. 5, ISSN 0006-3525, pages 555 - 567, XP002332346 [X] 5-17,20 * scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0282(19970415)41:5<555::AID-BIP7>3.0.CO;2-L | [A] - BYK G ET AL, "Local constrained shifty pseudopeptides inhibitors of ras-farnesyl transferase", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (19951116), vol. 5, no. 22, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2677 - 2682, XP004135213 [A] 1-14,17-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0960-894X(95)00482-9 | [PA] - LIN L S ET AL, "Specific and dual antagonists of [alpha]4[beta]1 and [alpha]4[beta]7 integrins", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS 21 JAN 2002 UNITED KINGDOM, (20020121), vol. 12, no. 2, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 133 - 136, XP002332347 [PA] 1-20 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(01)00705-3 | [PA] - LIN L S ET AL, "The discovery of acylated [beta]-amino acids as potent and orally bioavailable VLA-4 antagonists", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS 25 FEB 2002 UNITED KINGDOM, (20020225), vol. 12, no. 4, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 611 - 614, XP002332348 [PA] 1-20 * scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(01)00818-6 | [PA] - HAGMANN W K ET AL, "The discovery of sulfonylated dipeptides as Potent VLA-4 antagonists", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS 22 OCT 2001 UNITED KINGDOM, (20011022), vol. 11, no. 20, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2709 - 2713, XP002332349 [PA] 1-20 * tables 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(01)00544-3 | International search | [A]US5424329 (BOSCHELLI DIANE H [US], et al); | [Y]EP0618221 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]); | [Y]US5602099 (SCHILLER PETER [CA]); | [Y]US5229381 (DOHERTY JAMES B [US], et al); | [Y]EP0190852 ; | [Y]WO9204369 (DEPHA TEAM SRL [IT]); | [Y]WO9204369 | [A] - BOSCHELLI D. H., ET AL., "INHIBITION OF E-SELECTIN-, ICAM-1-, AND VCAM-1-MEDIATED CELL ADHESION BY BENZOÚB3⁄4THIOPHENE-, BENZOFURAN-, INDOLE-, AND NAPHTHALENE-2-CARBOXAMIDES: IDENTIFICATION OF PD 144795 AS AN ANTIINFLAMMATORY AGENT.", Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19950101), vol. 38., doi:10.1021/jm00022a026, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4597 - 4614., XP002913225 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00022a026 | [Y] - Chemical Abstracts Service (C A S), (19000101), Database accession no. 107-97096, XP002913226 | [Y] - Chemical Abstracts Service (C A S), (19000101), Database accession no. 105-227343, XP002913227 & EP0190852 A 00000000 | [Y] - Chemical Abstracts Service (C A S), (19000101), Database accession no. 120-107719, XP002913228 | [Y] - Chemical Abstracts Service (C A S), (19000101), Database accession no. 117-131564, XP002913229 & WO9204369 A 00000000 |